Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Koda et al

Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Steven Hiro Koda and Club BTS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2014cv00623
Filed: June 23, 2014
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) def Club BTS, LLC's 17 MOTION to Set Aside Default is granted; (2) the 11 order of default previously entered against def Club BTS, LLC is vacated; (4) def Steven Hiro Koda's 26 MOTI ON to Dismiss is denied; (5) by no later than 8/23/2016, both defs are to respond to the complaint in this case; (6) plf Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.s 38 notice of error in filing is construed as a motion to Strike the improperly denominated 34 Request for Waiver of Service and is granted. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/29/16. (djy, )
June 21, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Cason M. Kirby, counsel for defendants Steven Hiro Koda and Club BTS, LLC, having agreed during a telephone conference held on the record on 6/21/2016, to accept service on behalf of both defendants, it is ORDERED that plaintiff Joe Hand Promo tions, Inc., is afforded seven days from the date this order is entered to obtain an alias summons, effectuate service, and confirm to the court in a written filing that service has been perfected as further set out in the order. The pending motions by Club BTS to set aside default (doc. no. 17 ) and by Koda to dismiss Joe Hands claims against him (doc. no. 26 ) will be held in abeyance during this time. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/21/2016. (dmn, )
January 12, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DEFAULT: it is ORDERED as follows: (1) Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.'s 7 motion for entry of default is granted. (2) Default is entered against defendant Club BTS, LLC, d/b/a Club BTS. If plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. wants a default judgment, a new motion to that effect (which sets forth all of the requirements for such) must be filed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/12/2015. (kh, )
December 31, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that plf Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.'s 9 motion to extend time to serve dft for 90 days is granted and that plf Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. has until 1/19/2015, to serve dft Steven Hiro Koda. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/31/2014. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Koda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Forrest Page Gamble(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Hiro Koda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Club BTS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?