Alverson v. Copeland et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Rodney Alverson
Defendant: Mrs. Davenport, Stephanie Atchison, Nurse Giles, Corizon Medical Services, Ms. Copeland, Kim Tobias Thomas, Louis Boyd, John Crow and Phyllis Billups
Case Number: 2:2014cv00648
Filed: July 2, 2014
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the 53 Recommendation is ADOPTED, and that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/14/2015. (kh, )
September 16, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, upon an independent review of the file in this case and upon consideration of the 40 Recommendation, it is ORDERED that the 40 Recommendation is ADOPTED; further ORDERED that Plaintiff's motions for preliminary injuncti on filed on July 17, 2014 (Doc. # 17 ), July 18, 2014 (Doc. # 22 ), and July 24, 2014 (Doc. # 24 ) are DENIED, and that this action is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/16/14. (scn, )
August 26, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, upon an independent review of the file in this case and upon consideration of the 36 Recommendation, it is ORDERED that the Recommendation is ADOPTED; further ORDERED that Plaintiff's 1 motion for preliminary injunction filed on July 2, 2014, is DENIED and that this action is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/26/14. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alverson v. Copeland et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Davenport
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Sees(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Atchison
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Sees(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Giles
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Medical Services
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Copeland
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Tobias Thomas
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Sees(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Boyd
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Sees(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crow
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Sees(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis Billups
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Sees(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Alverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?