Blacksmith Multi-Media, Inc. et al v. The State of Alabama et al(MAG+)

Plaintiff: Blacksmith Multi-Media, Inc., Sharon E. Black and Robert E. Black
Defendant: The State of Alabama, UA-ASU-TSU Educational Public Radio, Alabama Educational Television Commission, Alabama Legislature, City of Montgomery, Montgomery Public School System and Chamber of Commerce
Case Number: 2:2014cv00651
Filed: July 7, 2014
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1) the plf's 68 Objections are OVERRULED; (2) ADOPTING 67 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge; (3) this case is DISMISSED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/22/16. (djy, )
May 7, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: This case will proceed on the amended complaint (doc. 35 ) filed on 4/3/2015 and against only the named individuals in that complaint: Lorenza Patrick, Dr. William H. Harris, John F. Knight, Jr., Candy Capel, Elton Dea n, Marvin Wiggins, Allan Pizzato, Ferris Stephens, and Gregory Griffin. The claims presented in the original complaint are superseded by the claims presented in the amended complaint. It is ORDERED that the plaintiffs' motions for leave to file an amended complaint (doc. 37 & 38 ) be and are hereby DENIED as further set out in the order. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to serve the defendants named in the amended complaint (doc. 35 ) at the addresses provided in the proposed amended complaints attached to the plaintiffs' motions to amend. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/7/2015. (dmn, )
February 17, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as follows: 1. That the 23 Amended Complaint filed on 11/5/2014 be and is hereby STRICKEN from the docket. 2. That on or before 3/3/2015, the plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint as further set out in the order. T he claims presented in the plaintiffs original complaint shall be superseded by the claims presented in the amended complaint. This means the plaintiffs shall no longer rely on the original complaint. Finally, it is ORDERED that the plaintiffs' 24 MOTION for Leave to Amend the 23 Amended Complaint be and is hereby DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 2/17/2015. (dmn, )
November 13, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 21 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge; the claims of plaintiff Blacksmith Multi-Media, Inc., are DISMISSED and Blacksmith Multi-Media, Inc., is DISMISSED as a party to this cause of action; and this case is REFERRED BACK to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/13/2014. (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blacksmith Multi-Media, Inc. et al v. The State of Alabama et al(MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blacksmith Multi-Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon E. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UA-ASU-TSU Educational Public Radio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Educational Television Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Legislature
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery Public School System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chamber of Commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?