Smith v. Edge, et al.

Plaintiff: Connie Smith
Defendant: Robert Edge, II and PFG Transco
Case Number: 2:2014cv00909
Filed: August 28, 2014
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2015 77 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER directing that: (1) because the pretrial hearing was held on 12/3/2015 @ 2:45 p.m., the hearing set for 12/9/2015 is cancelled; (2) the Non-Jury Trial of this cause, which is to last 3 days, is set for 1/20/2016 @ 10:00 AM b efore Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson, at the US Courthouse in Montgomery, AL; (3) the plf is required to file proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law by 12/9/2015; the defs are required to file proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law by 12/21/2015; the plf has until 1/4/2016 to file a reply, as further set out in order; (4) the parties in this case are not required to file trial briefs; Each party shall have available at the time of trial, for use by the court (the judge, th e courtroom deputy clerk, and the law clerk), three copies of the exhibit list and a sufficient number of copies of each photostatically reproducible exhibit for opposing counsel, the courtroom deputy clerk, the law clerk, and the judge to each have a set of the exhibits; (6) all deadlines not otherwise affected by this order will remain as set forth in the 11 uniform scheduling order, as further set out in order; (7) All understandings, agreements, deadlines, and stipulations contained in thi s pretrial order shall be binding on all parties unless this order be hereafter modified by order of the court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/4/15. Furnished to calendar group and AG (terminates 12/9/2015 PTC, reset NJT from 1/11/2016).(djy, ) . (Main Document 77 replaced on 12/4/2015 to correct erroneous main PDF document to correct typographical error in date) (qc/djy, ).
October 27, 2015 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 59 Motion for Reconsideration, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/27/15. (djy, )
October 26, 2015 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Motion to extend the dispositive-motion deadline, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/26/15. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Edge, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Smith
Represented By: Guy Rodney Willis(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Edge, II
Represented By: Ann P Hill(Designation Retained)
Represented By: William Claude McGowin(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFG Transco
Represented By: Ann P Hill(Designation Retained)
Represented By: William Claude McGowin(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?