C.D. v. Alabama CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. et al

Plaintiff: C.D.
Defendant: Alabama CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. and Coca-Cola Refreshments USA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2014cv00952
Filed: September 11, 2014
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER: It is ORDERED as follows: (1) At the June 10 fairness hearing, the parties are to present evidence that satisfies the question "What testimony and evidence should be produced at the hearing?" contained in the article Wil liam E. Shreve, Jr., Settling the Claims of a Minor, 72 Ala. Law. 308, 309 (2011). (2) Two business days prior to the hearing, the parties should submit to the court a proposed opinion and order that satisfy the question "What should be included in the order approving the settlement?" contained in said article. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/26/2015. (kh, )
May 22, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The court having been informed that this case is settled, it is further ORDERED that all unresolved motions are denied as moot. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/22/2015. (kh, )
October 27, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER directing that the removing defendant has until 11/7/2014 to amend the notice of removal to allege jurisdiction sufficiently, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/27/14. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.D. v. Alabama CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.D.
Represented By: Lloyd Weaver Gathings, II
Represented By: William A. Lattimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.
Represented By: James Allen Sydnor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca-Cola Refreshments USA, INC.
Represented By: Duncan Young Manley
Represented By: Michael Anthony Vercher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?