Davis v. City of Clanton Police Department et al (JOINT ASSIGN)(MAG+)

Plaintiff: Sadaka T. Davis
Defendant: City of Clanton Police Department, Daniel Eric Smitherman and Katrina Caver
Case Number: 2:2014cv00986
Filed: September 25, 2014
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Chilton
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2015 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Before the court is Plaintiff Sadaka Davis's 71 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. The motion is due to be denied. Accordingly, and for the reasons stated in the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Doc. 66 ) and in the 10/28/2015 Order adopting the Recommendation in part (Doc. 68 ), Petitioners appeal is without a legal or factual basis, has no substantive merit, and is frivolous for purposes of the IFP motion. Therefore, it is ORDERED that Petitioners motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis (Doc. 71 ) is DENIED as further set out in the order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/9/2015. (dmn, )
October 28, 2015 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: (1) Plaintiff's objection (Doc. # 67 ) is OVERRULED; (2) The Recommendation (Doc. # 66 ) is ADOPTED in part and REJECTED in part; (3) Defendant's motion for sanctions (Doc. # 58 ), which includes requests for dismissa l of this action in its entirety and for an award of monetary sanctions under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37, is GRANTED; (4) Plaintiff shall reimburse Defendant $788.01, which includes reasonable attorney's fees and costs associated wi th Plaintiff's failure to attend the properly noticed deposition; and (5) Defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings (Doc. # 61 ) pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(c) is DENIED. A separate final judgment will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/28/2015. (kh, )
March 26, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as follows: 1. Officer Smitherman's 35 Objection is OVERRULED. 2. The 33 Recommendation is ADOPTED. 3. Officer Smitherman's 12 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. 4. This case is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings on Mr. Davis's claim. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/26/2015. (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. City of Clanton Police Department et al (JOINT ASSIGN)(MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sadaka T. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Clanton Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Eric Smitherman
Represented By: Richard Warren Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katrina Caver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?