The Mill Steel Company et al v. Southeastern Stud & Component, Inc. et al (JOINT ASSIGN)

Plaintiff: The Mill Steel Company, Mill Steel Birmingham, LLC and MSSES Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Southeastern Stud & Component, Inc., Dixieland Metals of Alabama, L.L.C., J&S Investments, L.L.C., K2 Enterprises, L.L.C., Mid-South Steel LLC, Southeastern Stud, LLC and Kennon W. Whaley, Sr.
Case Number: 2:2014cv01023
Filed: October 2, 2014
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2015 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 54 Motion to Lift Stay; ORDERED that the stay imposed by Order dated November, 26, 2014, is LIFTED as to all parties, with the exception of Southeastern Stud & Components, Inc. It is further ORDERED, that Plaintiffs file a Third Amen ded Complaint on or before February 25, 2015, to reflect the current status of the litigation. Defendants are DIRECTED to answer, counterclaim, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint on or before March 9, 2015. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/19/2015. (kh, )
November 26, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that Plfs' 27 Motion to Stay Litigation in Light of Bankruptcy is GRANTED and all other pending motions are DENIED as moot; further ORDERED that, on the first day of each second month, beginning 2/1/2015, the parties are DIRECTED to file a joint report as to the status of the bankruptcy proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/26/2014. (wcl, )
October 22, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Motion to Continue Hearing; The hearing scheduled for 10/23/2014, at 3:00 p.m. in courtroom 2B of the Frank M. Johnson, Jr. U.S. Courthouse will take place as scheduled, but as a status and planning conference, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/22/2014. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Mill Steel Company et al v. Southeastern Stud & Component, Inc. et al (JOINT ASSIGN)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Mill Steel Company
Represented By: Derek Firth Meek
Represented By: Ryan David Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mill Steel Birmingham, LLC
Represented By: Derek Firth Meek
Represented By: Ryan David Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSSES Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Derek Firth Meek
Represented By: Ryan David Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeastern Stud & Component, Inc.
Represented By: Martha Geron Gadd
Represented By: Richard Hamilton Gill
Represented By: Von G. Memory
Represented By: Jamie Alisa Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixieland Metals of Alabama, L.L.C.
Represented By: Martha Geron Gadd
Represented By: Richard Hamilton Gill
Represented By: Von G. Memory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&S Investments, L.L.C.
Represented By: Martha Geron Gadd
Represented By: Richard Hamilton Gill
Represented By: Von G. Memory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K2 Enterprises, L.L.C.
Represented By: Martha Geron Gadd
Represented By: Richard Hamilton Gill
Represented By: Von G. Memory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-South Steel LLC
Represented By: Martha Geron Gadd
Represented By: Richard Hamilton Gill
Represented By: Von G. Memory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeastern Stud, LLC
Represented By: Martha Geron Gadd
Represented By: Richard Hamilton Gill
Represented By: Von G. Memory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennon W. Whaley, Sr.
Represented By: Martha Geron Gadd
Represented By: Richard Hamilton Gill
Represented By: Von G. Memory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?