Hunt v. Thomas, et al. (DEATH PENALTY)

Plaintiff: Gregory Hunt
Defendant: Kim Thomas and Walter Myers
Case Number: 2:2014cv01030
Filed: October 3, 2014
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: 1. The stay of this proceeding by order dated March 23, 2015 (Doc. # 30 ) is LIFTED. 2. Hunt shall FILE an amended complaint that complies with Local Rule 15.1, on or before July 28, 2015, to correct the deficiencies outlined abo ve. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of Hunts Eighth Amendment claim. 3. The State's 38 renewed motion to dismiss is DENIED with LEAVE TO REFILE following the filing of Hunts amended complaint. The State shall answer or otherwise respond to Hunts amended complaint no later than two (2) weeks from the date it is filed. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/21/2015. (kh, )
March 23, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: 1. This proceeding, including the State's deadline to answer Hunt's complaint, is STAYED generally. 2. Within fourteen (14) days from the Supreme Court's decision in Glossip, the parties shall jointly, if possible, or individually, if not, file a statement or appropriate motion that informs the court of their respective positions on the issues in this case in view of the Glossip decision. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/23/2015. (kh, )
March 16, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) The State's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 17 ) is GRANTED as to Counts II, III, and IV of Hunt's complaint, and those are claims are DISMISSED with PREJUDICE; (2) The State's Motion t o Dismiss (Doc. # 17 ) is DENIED as to Count I of Hunt's complaint; (3) To the extent Hunt intends to file a motion to stay his execution, as he indicated in the notice filed on March 10, 2015, he shall do so on or before March 18, 2015, and sh all limit any such motion to the merits of his sole remaining Eighth Amendment claim; if the State opposes a stay, it shall file its opposition to Hunt's motion to stay, along with supporting evidence, on or before March 23, 2015. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on March 16, 2015. (scn, )
March 13, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: ORDERED as follows: (1) The State's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 17 ) is GRANTED as to Counts II, III, and IV of Hunt's complaint, and those are claims are DISMISSED with PREJUDICE; (2) The S tate's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 17 ) is DENIED as to Count I of Hunt's complaint; (3) To the extent Hunt intends to file a motion to stay his execution, as he indicated in the notice filed on March 10, 2015, he shall do so on or before Ma rch 18, 2015, and shall limit any such motion to the merits of his sole remaining Eighth Amendment claim; if the State opposes a stay, it shall file its opposition to Hunt's motion to stay, along with supporting evidence, on or before March 23, 2015. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 03/13/2015. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. Thomas, et al. (DEATH PENALTY)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Hunt
Represented By: William Marcus Ermine
Represented By: John Anthony Palombi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?