McCall v. Montgomery Housing Authority et al (JOINT ASSIGN)(MAG+)
Plaintiff: |
Minnie McCall |
Defendant: |
Montgomery Housing Authority and Yvette Hester |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv01113 |
Filed: |
October 24, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama |
Office: |
Montgomery Office |
County: |
Montgomery |
Presiding Judge: |
Terry F. Moorer |
Presiding Judge: |
Myron H. Thompson |
Nature of Suit: |
Housing/Accommodations |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 5, 2019 |
Filing
114
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: 1) The Plf's motion to amend her objections (doc. 113 ) is GRANTED; 2) The Plf's motion for a hearing (doc. 112 ) is DENIED; 3) The Plf's objections (docs. 111 & 113 ) are OVERRULED; 4) The Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (doc. 108 ) is ADOPTED; 5. The Defs' motion for summary judgment (doc. 90 ) is GRANTED; and 6) This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 11/5/2019. (cnw, )
|
September 29, 2017 |
Filing
60
OPINION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that: 1. McCall's 55 Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint is DENIED; and 2. The defendants' 44 Joint Motion to Strike and for Sanctions is DENIED as further set out in the opinion and o rder. McCall incorrectly refers to Defendant Evette Hester as Yvette Hester. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to change this defendants name on the docket sheet from Yvette Hester to Evette Hester, and the court will refer to this defendant as Evette H ester from this point forward in the proceedings. In addition, while McCalls second amended complaint names the Montgomery Board of Commissioners as a defendant, MHA has informed the court and McCall that the Montgomery Board of Commissioners is not a legal entity, and to the extent McCall attempts to assert claims against the Montgomery Board of Commissioners, those claims are duplicitous of the claims she is asserting against MHA. For this reason, the court construes the defense motions currently pending before it as filed on behalf of MHA and Hester only. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 9/29/2017. (dmn, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?