Taylor v. Hughes et al (Joint Assign)
Plaintiff: Bonny Edward Taylor
Defendant: Henry P. Hughes, Dianne Williams, Jean Brown, Bill Blue and Ed Norman
Case Number: 2:2014cv01163
Filed: November 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court grants in part and denies in part Defendants' Motion to Renew 214 their motion for summary judgment on the basis of qualified immunity. The Court grants Defendants' request for the Court to addre ss the question of whether their alleged actions violated clearly established law. But the Court denies the renewed motion for summary judgment as to whether Defendants' alleged actions violated clearly established law, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Keith Starrett on 11/4/2019. (kr, )
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the 108 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted as further set out in the order. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Henry Hughes, Roy Parker, Benjamin Hunter, and Bill Blue are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge Keith Starrett on 8/31/2017. (dmn, )
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court denies Defendant Advanced E.M.S., Inc.'s 112 Motion for Summary Judgment as further set out in the opinion and order. Signed by Honorable Judge Keith Starrett on 8/28/2017. (dmn, )
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: It is THEREFORE ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion to Exclude McAndrew 111 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion to Exclude Sobel 114 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that th e Motion to Exclude Gonzalez 115 is deferred. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion to Exclude Lauridson 116 is deferred. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion to Strike Supplemental Disclosures 141 is granted. IT IS F URTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion to Strike Gonzalez Affidavit 142 is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion to Strike Lauridson Affidavit 143 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion to Strike Sobel Affidavit 144 is denied. Signed by Honorable Judge Keith Starrett on 8/18/2017. (dmn, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Hughes et al (Joint Assign)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonny Edward Taylor
Represented By: Michael J. Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry P. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianne Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Blue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?