The City of Eufaula, Alabama et al v. Alabama Department of Transportation et al
Plaintiff: |
The City of Eufaula, Alabama, Eufaula Heritage Association, Alabama Trust for Historic Preservation and National Trust for Historic Preservation |
Defendant: |
Alabama Department of Transportation, John R. Cooper, Federal Highway Administration and Mark Bartlett |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv01206 |
Filed: |
December 8, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama |
Office: |
Montgomery Office |
County: |
Barbour |
Presiding Judge: |
Myron H. Thompson |
Presiding Judge: |
Wallace Capel |
Nature of Suit: |
Environmental Matters |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 4321 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 22, 2015 |
Filing
47
JUDGMENT: The court having been informed that the remaining claims of the plaintiff City of Eufaula, Alabama, are now settled, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that the claims of plaintiff City of Eufaula, Alabama, are dismissed wit h prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs and with leave to the parties, within 49 days, to stipulate to a different basis for dismissal or to stipulate to the entry of judgment instead of dismissal, and with leave to any party to file, w ithin 49 days, a motion to have the dismissal set aside and the claims reinstated or the settlement enforced, should the settlement not be consummated. Plaintiff City of Eufaula, Alabama, is terminated as a party to this action. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to FRCP 58. This case is not closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/22/2015. (dmn, )
|
December 10, 2014 |
Filing
18
ORDER: Based on representations made on-the-record on 12/9/2014, it is ORDERED that the 2 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order is set for submission, withe briefs due, on 12/22/2014, with the court to reach its decision on 12/31/2014. The stat e has agreed to delay its groundbreaking until the court has decided on the matter. Motion Submission Deadline set for 12/22/2014. In addition, the parties should also address in their briefs why Pennhurst State School & Hospital v. Halderman, 465 U.S. 89 (1984), does not preclude the state-law claims in this case as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/10/2014. (dmn, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?