Towles v. Mendle et al(INMATE 1)(NO DISCOVERY)
Plaintiff: Rolland Sean Towles
Defendant: Bob Mendle and Tahir Siddiq
Case Number: 2:2015cv00146
Filed: March 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Bullock
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER, upon consideration of plf's 186 "onDenied Motion for Expedited Hearing: it is ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge's 185 Order is affirmed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/8/16. (djy, )
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER as follows: (1) The 129 Recommendation of the magistrate judge is adopted. (2) The motions for preliminary injunction (doc. nos. 72 and 73 ) are denied. (3) This case is referred back to the magistrate judge for further appropriate proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/25/2015. (dmn, )
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDERED that the 133 motion for temporary restraining order is denied. It is further ORDERED that this case is referred back to the United States Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/21/2015. (kh, )
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 OPINION AND ORDER as follows: 1. The 93 Objection to the Recommendation is overruled. 2. The 86 Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge is adopted. 3. The 63 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is denied. It is further ORDERED that this case is referred back to the United States Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/28/2015. (dmn, )
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER that the motions for temporary restraining order (doc. nos. 63 , 72 , and 73 ) are denied. It is further ORDERED that this case is referred back to the United States Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/25/2015. (dmn, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Towles v. Mendle et al(INMATE 1)(NO DISCOVERY)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolland Sean Towles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Mendle
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tahir Siddiq
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?