Youngblood v. Alabama Department of Corrections, et al. (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: |
Gary W. Youngblood |
Defendant: |
Alabama Department of Corrections, Carter Davenport, Warden Carter, Phelix Woods, Captain Lawson, Captain Bryant and Gerald Wagner |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00214 |
Filed: |
April 6, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama |
Office: |
Montgomery Office |
County: |
Barbour |
Presiding Judge: |
Myron H. Thompson |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan Russ Walker |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 1, 2015 |
Filing
84
ORDER that this matter is before the court on plaintiffs objection to the courts order assessing a $ 505 filing fee on his second notice of interlocutory appeal. Plaintiff argues that the second notice of interlocutory appeal should have been tr eated as an amended notice of interlocutory appeal, and the new filing fee should not have been assessed. Upon consideration of the objection, it is ORDERED as follows: (1) The objection (doc. no. 77) is construed as a motion for reconsideration. (2) The motion for reconsideration (doc. no. 77) is granted. (3) The order (doc. no. 74) assessing fees for the second notice of appeal is vacated. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 09/01/2015. (ydw, ) Copies mailed to plaintiff, and Account Clerk at Easterling Correctional Facility as directed. Furnished to Cashier and Financial Section.
|
August 17, 2015 |
Filing
74
ORDER re 66 Notice of Appeal filed by Gary W. Youngblood. Pursuant to the provisions of the Prison Litigation Reform Act 28 U.S.C. § 1915, the plaintiff is required to pay the requisite $ 505.00 fee for filing this notice of appeal as fu rther set out in the order. To aid those persons having custody of the plaintiff in complying with the requirements of this order, the clerk of this court is DIRECTED to furnish a copy of this order to the inmate account clerk at the institution of the plaintiffs confinement. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/17/2015. Copies mailed to plaintiff, and Account Clerk at Easterling Correctional Facility as directed. Furnished to Cashier and Financial Section.(dmn, )
|
August 7, 2015 |
Filing
65
ORDER that plaintiff's 60 Motion to Proceed on Appeal in forma pauperis denied as further set out in the order; and that the appeal in this cause is certified, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a), as not taken in good faith.Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/7/2015. (dmn, )
|
August 3, 2015 |
Filing
58
OPINION AND ORDER that the plf's 28 motion for reconsideration, as supplemented (doc. no. 29 ), is denied. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/3/2015. (wcl, )
|
May 7, 2015 |
Filing
24
ORDER directing that, upon an independent and de novo review of the record, it is ORDERED that: (1) The plaintiff's objections (doc. nos. 21 and 22 ) are overruled; (2) The United States Magistrate Judge's recommendation (doc. no. 20 ) is adopted; (3) The plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction (doc. no. 1 ) is denied; (4) This cause is referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on May 7, 2015. (scn, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?