Sellers v. Renewable Fuels, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Philip Lightfoot Sellers
Defendant: Renewable Fuels, LLC and John F. Colquitt
Case Number: 2:2015cv00236
Filed: April 10, 2015
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED that the Motions for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. # 45 , 46 ) are DENIED. The case will proceed to trial on all pending claims. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 6/28/2016. (kh, )
February 23, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1) the 32 and 34 Motions to Continue are GRANTED; (2) the 33 motion to withdraw will be granted upon the entry of a notice of appearance by new counsel for the defendants; the defendants are ORDERED to secure new counsel no later than 3/21/2016; (3) current counsel of record for the defs are ORDERED to immediately provide the defs' addresses to the Clerk; (4) directing the clerk to serve copies of this order upon Renewale Fuels, LLC and John F. Colquitt at the addresses provided by counsel of record, and current counsel of record are ORDERED to advise Renewable Fuels, LLC and John F. Colquitt of this order by the fastest available method, and to file with the court a Notice that that has been done. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 2/23/16. (djy, )
August 13, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as follows: 1. The 14 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED as to the breach of fiduciary duty claim in Count IV and that claim is DISMISSED as further set out in the opinion and order. 2. The Motion to Dismiss is DENIED in all other respects as further set out in the opinion and order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 8/13/2015. (dmn, )
June 3, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as follows: 1. The 2 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED as to the claims against John F. Colquitt and John F. Colquitt is dismissed without prejudice. The Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as to the claim for punitive damages. 2. T he Plaintiff is given until 6/15/2015, to file a new Amended Complaint which is complete unto itself in accordance with M.D. Ala. Local Rule 15.1, and which sets out separate claims against each of the two Defendants. If the Plaintiff does not file an Amended Complaint, the case will proceed only against Renewable Fuels, LLC. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 6/3/2015. (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sellers v. Renewable Fuels, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Lightfoot Sellers
Represented By: Philip A Sellers, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renewable Fuels, LLC
Represented By: Charles Nelson Gill
Represented By: Richard Hamilton Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Colquitt
Represented By: Charles Nelson Gill
Represented By: Richard Hamilton Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?