Dudley v. Corizon Medical Services et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: John Patrick Dudley
Defendant: Corizon Medical Services, Sgt. Calvin, Nurse Long, Alabama Department of Corrections, Lt. Tate and Staton Correctional Facility
Case Number: 2:2015cv00287
Filed: April 30, 2015
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 26 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order; This case is referred back to the United States Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/13/2016. (wcl, )
June 24, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that: 1. Plaintiff's 6/22/2015, pleading, considered a Motion to Dismiss his complaint regarding inadequate medical care against Defendants Long and Corizon Medical Services (Doc. No. 7 ), be GRA NTED; 2. Plaintiffs complaint against Defendants Long and Corizon Medical Services regarding allegedly inadequate medical care be DISMISSED and Defendants Long and Corizon Medical Services be DISMISSED as parties to this complaint; 3. The complaint, regarding Plaintiffs failure to protect from an inmate assault claim against the remaining defendants, be REFERRED to the undersigned for additional proceedings. In light of the foregoing, it is ORDERED that the courts 6/15/2015, order (Doc. No. 5 ) is WITHDRAWN. Objections to R&R due by 7/8/2015. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. on 6/24/2015. (dmn, )
May 1, 2015 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $46.40 be paid on or before May 22, 2015; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Staton Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/1/2015. (kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dudley v. Corizon Medical Services et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Patrick Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Calvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staton Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?