Trinidad v. Moore et al

Plaintiff: Jose A. Trinidad
Defendant: Daniel Joe Moore, Jr. and RDB Trucking, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv00323
Filed: May 15, 2015
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2016 176 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants Motions in Limine are due to be granted in part and denied in part as set forth below: 1. Defendants Motion in Limine #'s 1, 2, 3, 4, 7, and 13, (Doc.s 90 , 91 , 92 , 93 , 96 , and 102 ), are GRANTE D to the extent Plaintiff seeks to offer such evidence in the first trial as further set out in the opinion and order. 2. Defendants Motion in Limine #1, (Doc. 90 ), is GRANTED to the extent Plaintiff seeks to offer such evidence in the second trial as further set out in the opinion and order. 3. Defendants Motion in Limine #s 2, 3, 4, 7, and 13, (Doc.s 91 , 92 , 93 , 96 , and 102 ), are DENIED to the extent Plaintiff seeks to offer such evidence in the second trial as further set out in the opinion and order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 12/22/2016. (dmn, )
September 26, 2016 146 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as follows: Plaintiff's 133 Motion for Continuance for is GRANTED to the extent that the Jury Trial is continued from 10/3/2016 to the court's term of court commencing 12/12/2016 Honorable Judge W. Harold Albr itton III. The case is set for Final Pretrial Conference on 11/9/2016 before Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton III. The Plaintiff is given until 10/28/2016 to complete discovery on drug test and related matters as further set out in the order. The parties are given until 10/3/2016 to file responses to the opposing partys objections to their exhibit lists, with copies of exhibits to which they do not concede objections attached. No discovery not covered by this Order will be allowed and all other existing deadlines remain in full force and effect. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/26/2016. Copies furnished to calendar group, JT. (dmn, )
September 23, 2016 138 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as follows: 1. Motion in Limine #5 (Doc. 94 ) is GRANTED. The Plaintiff is not to refer to any inference that Moore fled the scene of the accident at trial unless the Plaintiff first takes the issue up outside of the pre sence of the jury. 2. Motion in Limine #6 (Doc. 95 ) is GRANTED as to the Alabama Accident Report as affirmative evidence but is DENIED to the extent that the accident report is admissible for impeachment pursuant to Rule 613. 3. Motion in Limine #9 (Doc. 98 ) is DENIED. 4. Motion in Limine #11 (Doc 100 ) is GRANTED and all parties are prohibited from admitting into evidence or from referring to insurance coverage available to the Defendants for the claims in this lawsuit. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/23/2016. (dmn, )
September 20, 2016 132 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED as follows: The Defendants' 48 Daubert Motion to Preclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Jon P. Dillard is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set out further in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/20/2016. (dmn, )
August 31, 2016 74 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that the 49 Motion in Limine is GRANTED only to the extent that opinions of Johnson as to the credibility of eyewitnesses, to the extent they are offered, are excluded as further set out in the order. The Motion is DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 8/31/2016. (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trinidad v. Moore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Trinidad
Represented By: Henry Cooper Ellenberg, II(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Thomas Shealer Moore(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Joe Moore, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RDB Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?