Downes v. Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: James R. Downes
Defendant: Department of Corrections, Carter Davenport, Warden Carter, Lt. Woods, Mrs. Blakley, State of Alabama and Jefferson S. Dunn
Case Number: 2:2015cv00437
Filed: June 19, 2015
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2015 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: (1) Plaintiff's 87 motion for reconsideration is DENIED; and (2) Plaintiff's 86 objection to the order denying appointment of counsel is OVERRULED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/15/2015. (kh, )
November 20, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: (1) Plaintiffs objection (Doc. # 80 ) is OVERRULED; (2) The Recommendation (Doc. # 77 ) is ADOPTED; (3) Plaintiffs motions for preliminary injunction (Docs. # 3 , 4 ) are DENIED; and (4) This action is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/20/2015. (kh, )
July 27, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: 1. The 16 Recommendation is ADOPTED. 2. Mr. Downes's claims against the State of Alabama and the Department of Corrections are DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). 3. The State of Alabama and the Departm ent of Corrections are DISMISSED as Defendants. 4. The case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/27/2015. (kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downes v. Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Downes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Represented By: Albert Sim Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter Davenport
Represented By: Albert Sim Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Carter
Represented By: Albert Sim Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Woods
Represented By: Albert Sim Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Blakley
Represented By: Albert Sim Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama
Represented By: Albert Sim Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?