Hayden v. Vance, et al. (MAG+)

Plaintiff: Steven Mark Hayden
Defendant: Robert S. Vance, Jr., Anne-Marie Adams, J. Scott Vowell, Houston Brown, Roy Moore, James Allen Main, Alisa Kelli Wise, Gregory Shaw, Lyn Stuart, Thomas Francis Parker, William B. Cashion, Western Steel Inc., Merchants Commercial Bank, William C. Thompson, Craig Sorrell Pittman, Terri Willingham Thomas, Terry A. Moore, Scott Donaldson, U.S. Department of Justice and Joyce White Vance
Case Number: 2:2015cv00469
Filed: July 2, 2015
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2016 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1) plf's 104 Objections are OVERRULED; (2) the 103 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; (3) the 77 Motion for Attorneys' fees and costs is GRANTED to the extent that defs are entitled to an award of $15,000.00 in attorneys' fees and $76.06 in costs and expenses and DENIED to the extent defs seek fees and expenses beyond these amounts; (4) the 86 MOTION for lawyer discipline and FRCP Rule 35 Exam is DENIED; (5) the 102 MOTION to Strike is DENIED; (6) the 102 MOTION to Alter Judgment is DENIED; (3) the 102 MOTION for Sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/4/16. (djy, )
April 6, 2016 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plf's 72 Motion to reconsider or amend, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/6/16. (djy, )
March 14, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER it is ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff's Objections (Docs. # 65 , 66 , 68 ) are OVERRULED. (2) The Recommendation is ADOPTED. (3) Plaintiff's Motion to Amend (Doc. # 55 ) is DENIED. (4) Defendants William B. Cashion, Western Steel Inc. , and Merchants Commercial Bank's motions to dismiss (Docs. # 25 , 42 ) are GRANTED. (5) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 24 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED as moot in part. The motion is GRANTED as to the claims against Defendants Anne-Marie Adams, Houston Brown, Scott Donaldson, James Allen Main, Terry A. Moore, Thomas Francis Parker, Craig Sorrell Pittman, Gregory Shaw, Lyn Stuart, Terri Willingham Thomas, William C. Thompson, Robert S. Vance, Jr., J. Scott Vowell, and Alisa Kelli Wise. The motion is DENIED as moot for the claims against Roy Moore in his individual capacity because Plaintiff voluntarily dismissed the individual capacity claims. (6) Defendant Roy Moore's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 50 ) the claims ag ainst him in his official capacity is GRANTED. (7) Defendant Joyce Vance's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 35 ) is GRANTED and her alternative Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as moot. (8) The Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 37 ) filed by the United States and the U.S. Department of Justice is GRANTED. (9) The federal claims in the original and amended complaints (Docs. # 1 , 33 ) are DISMISSED with prejudice. (10) The court declines supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims and the state law claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. (11) Plaintiff's remaining motions (Docs. # 1 , 32 , 41 , 48 , 53 ) are DENIED. (12) This matter is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for a determination regarding attorneys' fees. A separate final judgment will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/14/2016. (kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayden v. Vance, et al. (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Mark Hayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Vance, Jr.
Represented By: Todd Elbert Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne-Marie Adams
Represented By: Todd Elbert Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Scott Vowell
Represented By: Todd Elbert Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Brown
Represented By: Todd Elbert Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Moore
Represented By: Todd Elbert Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Allen Main
Represented By: Todd Elbert Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alisa Kelli Wise
Represented By: Todd Elbert Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Shaw
Represented By: Todd Elbert Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyn Stuart
Represented By: Todd Elbert Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Francis Parker
Represented By: Todd Elbert Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William B. Cashion
Represented By: Starr Turner Drum
Represented By: James Lawrence Goyer, III(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Steel Inc.
Represented By: Starr Turner Drum
Represented By: James Lawrence Goyer, III(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merchants Commercial Bank
Represented By: Starr Turner Drum
Represented By: James Lawrence Goyer, III(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William C. Thompson
Represented By: Todd Elbert Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Sorrell Pittman
Represented By: Todd Elbert Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Willingham Thomas
Represented By: Todd Elbert Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry A. Moore
Represented By: Todd Elbert Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Donaldson
Represented By: Todd Elbert Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce White Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?