Carter v. The City of Montgomery et al (JOINT ASSIGN)
Plaintiff: Aldaress Carter
Defendant: The City of Montgomery and Branch D. Kloess
Case Number: 2:2015cv00555
Filed: August 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 369 MEMORANDUM OPINION: Based on the foregoing, the Court will DENY the 306 motion for class certification and DENY the 332 motion to reconsider by separate order. Signed by Honorable Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/23/2020. (amf, )
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 293 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/7/2020. (djy, )
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 281 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING plf's 251 MOTION to Compel Discovery from JCS filed by Aldaress Carter, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/3/2020. (djy, )
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 171 Second MOTION to Compel, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/14/19. (djy, )
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/29/19. (djy, )
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MEMORANDUM OPINION, for the reasons stated herein, the Court DENIES Defendant Branch D. Kloess's 104 Motionto Sever; A separate Order 139 was issued on 3/29/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/20/18. (djy, )
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM OPINION, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/10/17. (djy, )
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 47 Motion for Leave to File a supplement to the motion to dismiss; further ORDERING: (1) that on or before 12/9/2015 def CHC shall file a supplemental motion to dismiss; (2) that, no later than 21 days after def CHC's supplemen tal motion is filed, plf shall file a brief in response to thesupplemental motion; and (3) that, within 7 days of the filing of plf's response to the supplemental motion, def CHC may file a single reply to both of plfs' briefs, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/7/15. (djy, )
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER directing : (1) that the 44 MOTION to Strike is GRANTED; (2) that CHC's 43 supplemental brief is STRICKEN; (3) that, on or before 12/7/2015, def CHC shall file a motion for leave to file a supplement to its motion to dismiss and sh all show cause why the motion for leave to file should be granted; and (4) pending the court's ruling on CHC's forthcoming motion for leave to file, the deadline for CHC to file a reply to plf's response brief is suspended, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/24/15. (djy, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. The City of Montgomery et al (JOINT ASSIGN)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aldaress Carter
Represented By: William M Dawson, Jr.
Represented By: George Daniel Evans
Represented By: Maurine C. Evans
Represented By: Alexandria Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Montgomery
Represented By: Joel Thomas Caldwell
Represented By: Shannon Lynn Holliday
Represented By: Robert David Segall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branch D. Kloess
Represented By: Micheal Stewart Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?