Webb v. Dunn et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Jimmy Lee Webb
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn, Kenneth L. Jones, E. Miles, T. Ellison and Tahir Siddiq
Case Number: 2:2015cv00654
Filed: September 11, 2015
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Bullock
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that: (1) The 20 Recommendation is ADOPTED; (2) Plaintiff's 16 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED; and (3) This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. A separate final judgment will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/13/2016. (dmn, )
November 24, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 10 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED and that Plaintiff's unsanitary conditions and inadequate medical treatment claims are DISMISSED without prejudice for failure of Plaintiff to file an amendment to the complaint as directed by the orders of the court. This action is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/24/2015. (dmn, )
October 15, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the 7 Recommendation is ADOPTED and that Plf's 5 motion to certify case as a class action is DENIED; further ORDERED that this action is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/15/2015. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Dunn et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Lee Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tahir Siddiq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?