Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation v. Ravello Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation |
Defendant: |
Ravello Solutions, LLC, Cheyenne Holdings, LLC, Thomas G. Rosencrants and Eileen M. Rosencrants |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00685 |
Filed: |
September 18, 2015 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Alabama |
Office: |
Montgomery Office |
County: |
Montgomery |
Presiding Judge: |
Myron H. Thompson |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan Russ Walker |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 27, 2019 |
Filing
78
ORDER directing as follows: (1) plf's 62 Motion to Amend the complaint is DENIED; (2) defs' 65 Motion to Quash post-judgment discovery is DENIED, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/27/19. (djy, )
|
September 4, 2018 |
Filing
48
JUDGMENT directing as follows: (1) 36 Plf Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporations 36 motion to lift stay and confirm arbitration award is granted to the extent that the stay is lifted and the arbitral award is confirmed as set forth in i t against defendants Ravello Solutions, LLC, Cheyenne Holdings, LLC, and Thomas Rosencrants ; (2) plf shall have and recover from def Ravello Solutions, LLC the sum of $ 475,000 for breach of contract; Plaintiff shall have and recover from def endant Cheyenne Holdings, LLC the sum of $ 300,000 for breach of contract; (4) The fees and expenses of arbitration totaling $ 28,122.35 are taxed against defendants RavelloSolutions, LLC, Cheyenne Holdings, LLC, and Rosencrants in equal shares, as further set out in order ; (5) Plf shall have and recover from defs Ravello Solutions, LLC, Cheyenne Holdings, LLC, and Rosencrants post-award and pre-judgment interest on all portions of the award., as further set out in order; furt her ORDERING that the parties provide notice by 10/1/2018, of their intent to submit any additional motions, including motions for post-judgment discovery or Fed.R.Civ.P. 11 sanctions ; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; this case remains closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/4/18. (djy, )
|
March 3, 2016 |
Filing
34
ORDERED as follows: (1) The 23 motion to stay is granted; (2) The 28 motion for sanctions and 30 motion to dismiss are denied with leave to refile; (3) The 29 emergency motion for extension of time to file an answer to the amended complaint i s granted, and the deadline for answering the amended complaint shall begin to run on the day the stay is lifted; DIRECTING the clerk to close this matter administratively until further notice of the court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/3/2016. (wcl, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?