Wilson v. Dunn et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Eric Wilson
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn, Young Boozer, Louis Boyd, State Fire Marshall, Public Health Department, State Personnel Department and Public Safety Department
Case Number: 2:2015cv00770
Filed: October 21, 2015
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that: (1) the 33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; (2) plf's 30 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED; (3) this case is DISMISSED without prejudice; and (4) no costs are taxed. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/30/16. (djy, )
July 25, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 28 Recommendation is ADOPTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's 1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED and that this action is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/25/2016. (dmn, )
December 14, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that: (1) The 4 Recommendation is ADOPTED; and (2) This case is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure of Plf to pay the initial partial filing fee. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/14/2015. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Dunn et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Boozer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Fire Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Health Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Personnel Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Safety Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?