Collins et al v. BSI Financial Services et al
Plaintiff: Mariann Collins and Rick Collins
Defendant: BSI Financial Services, Servis One Inc., MCM Capital Partners LLC, Ventures Trust 2013-I-H-R and CitiMortgage Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00262
Filed: April 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Chilton
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Plfs' 113 motion for extension of time to file appeal is GRANTED; Pursuant to FRAP 4(a)(5)(C), the time for filing an appeal is extended for 14 days after the date of this order, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 9/28/2020. (bes, )
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Plfs' 110 Motion to Alter, Amend or Vacate is DENIED, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 7/6/2020. (bes, )
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING the Defendants' 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment; A separate final judgment will follow. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 12/19/2019. (am, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins et al v. BSI Financial Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariann Collins
Represented By: Kenneth James Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Collins
Represented By: Kenneth James Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSI Financial Services
Represented By: Jason Bryon Tingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Servis One Inc.
Represented By: Jason Bryon Tingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCM Capital Partners LLC
Represented By: Jason Bryon Tingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventures Trust 2013-I-H-R
Represented By: Jason Bryon Tingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Blackmon Cash
Represented By: Richard Carlton Keller
Represented By: Rik Standford Tozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?