United States of America v. $389,820.00 in United States Currency et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $389,820.00 in United States Currency, $15,780.00 in United States Currency, $4,550.00 in United States Currency, 1972 Chevrolet Chevelle, SS 396, VIN: 1D37H2R582820, with All Appurtenances and Attachments Thereon and Miscellaneous Jewelry, namely: 18k yellow gold Rolex watch, side serial nos. v390198 and 218238, inside serial no. 2148; 3-row 14k yellow gold diamond bracelet with 11.47 carats in 93 diamonds, etc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00985
Filed: December 20, 2016
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
0 Judge: W. Harold Albritton
1 Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by plf as to why 47 Motion to Stay should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 10/27/2017; the motion will be taken under submission on that day for determination without oral argument. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 10/12/17. (djy, )
September 1, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot United States' 39 Second Motion to Strike Claim of Ruby Barton, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/1/17. (djy, )
July 20, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that the pending 38 motion for reconsideration was just cause for the claimant to await a ruling before filing an answer, as further set out in order; the claimant is given until 7/27/2017 to file an answer if she wishes to do so; if she fails to file an answer by that time, the 39 motion to strike will be granted. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 7/20/17. (djy, )
June 28, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING Barton's 14 MOTION to Dismiss and the Government's 15 MOTION to Strike ; further ORDERING that Ruby Barton has until 7/14/2017 to file an answer. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 6/28/17. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $389,820.00 in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin P Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $389,820.00 in United States Currency
Represented By: Michael Lee Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $15,780.00 in United States Currency
Represented By: Michael Lee Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,550.00 in United States Currency
Represented By: Michael Lee Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1972 Chevrolet Chevelle, SS 396, VIN: 1D37H2R582820, with All Appurtenances and Attachments Thereon
Represented By: Michael Lee Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miscellaneous Jewelry, namely: 18k yellow gold Rolex watch, side serial nos. v390198 and 218238, inside serial no. 2148; 3-row 14k yellow gold diamond bracelet with 11.47 carats in 93 diamonds, etc.
Represented By: Michael Lee Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?