Jones v. Ellington et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: |
Andre Deon Jones |
Defendant: |
Edward Ellington, T. Myrick, James Kelly, Brenda King, J. Wiggins, J. Morris and Nurse Mitchell |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv00026 |
Filed: |
January 11, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama |
Office: |
Montgomery Office |
County: |
Elmore |
Presiding Judge: |
Terry F. Moorer |
Presiding Judge: |
William Keith Watkins |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 19, 2017 |
Filing
29
ORDER: Plaintiff, a state inmate, filed this 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint on January 11, 2017. Prior to service of the complaint, Plaintiff filed a motion (Doc. # 25 ) wherein he requests dismissal of this case. The court construes the motion as a n otice of dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), which permits voluntary dismissal by a plaintiff "before the opposing party serves either an answer or a motion for summary judgment[.]" Under Fed. R. Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(B), such d ismissal is "without prejudice." Because the notice of dismissal comports with Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Andre Deon Jones's claims against Defendants Edward Ellington, T. Myrick, James Kelly, Brenda King, J. Wiggins, J. Morris, and Nurse Mitchell have been dismissed by operation of Rule 41(a)(1). The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/19/2017. (kh, )
|
June 30, 2017 |
Filing
28
ORDER: On March 30, 3017, the Magistrate Judge filed a Recommendation to which no timely objections have been filed. (Doc. # 24 .) Upon an independent review of the record and upon consideration of the Recommendation, it is ORDERED that the Reco mmendation (Doc. # 24 ) is ADOPTED. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction (Doc. # 1 ) is DENIED and that this case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/30/2017. (kh, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?