Hughes v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (JOINT ASSIGN)(MAG+)

Plaintiff: Tiffany Hughes
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 2:2017cv00225
Filed: April 17, 2017
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Autauga
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12102
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2018 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that: (1) Wal-Mart's 58 objections are OVERRULED; (2) the 48 motion to compel is GRANTED; (3) The orders of the Magistrate Judge (Docs. # 56 , 57 ) are ADOPTED, except that the deadlines for a jo int protective order and for production are modified below; (4) on or before 10/26/2018, plf and def Wal-Mart shall file a joint motion for a protective order that will govern production of customer-patient information; (5) on or before 11/2/2018 Def endant Wal-Mart shall produce to Plaintiff the names of any people including Wal-Mart's customerpatients who were at the pharmacy counter on 7/6/2016, when the discussion between Plaintiff and Defendant Hughes occurred; and (6) This case is again REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636 for further proceedings, determinations, and recommendations as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/15/18. (djy, )
September 4, 2018 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why 63 Motion to Compel should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 9/14/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/4/18. (djy, )
June 29, 2018 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why 48 Motion to Compel should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 7/13/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 6/29/18. (djy, )
May 7, 2018 46 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER GRANTING 45 Joint MOTION for Extension of deadlines as follows: Section 2: Dispositive Motions 9/18/2018;Section 3: The Parties Settlement Conference 10/9/2018;Section 7: Discovery Cutoff 9/14/2018; advising the parties that the extensions may necessitate the entry of a new scheduling order at a later date depending on the Court's schedule. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 5/7/18. (djy, )
February 22, 2018 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 36 MOTION for leave; directing that on or before 3/9/2018, def shall file a reply to plfs' response to its motion to dismiss. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 2/22/18. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (JOINT ASSIGN)(MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?