Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc. v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc. and Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc. doing business as D. James Kennedy Ministries
Defendant: AmazonSmile Foundation, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc., GuideStar USA, Inc. and AmazonSmile Foundation
Case Number: 2:2017cv00566
Filed: August 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David A Baker
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
2 Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 USCA JUDGMENT Entered 7/28/2021 as Mandate as to #70 Notice of Appeal filed by Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc., 11th Circuit Appeal No. 19-14125-CC: It is hereby ordered, adjudged, and decreed that the opinion issued on this date in this appeal is entered as the judgment of this Court. (dmn, )
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 SIGNED Opinion received from USCA Entered on 11th Circuit Appeal No. 19-14125-CC as to Appellant Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc. Decision: AFFIRMED. Opinion type: Published. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions. (dmn, )
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER of USCA as to #70 Notice of Appeal filed by Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc., 11th Circuit Appeal No. 19-14125-CC: The joint motion for an extension of time to and including 3/23/2020 in which to file Appellee's briefs is GRANTED, with the appendices, if any, due seven (7) days from the filing of the briefs. (dmn, )
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Alabama certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #70 Notice of Appeal, Appeal No. 19-14125-CC. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (dmn, )
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of ORAL ARGUMENTS (PDF ACCESS RESTRICTED FOR 90 DAYS) for dates of May 29, 2018 before Judge Myron H. Thompson, re #70 Notice of Appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patricia G. Starkie, Telephone number 334-262-1221. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION DUE WITHIN 7 BUSINESS DAYS. Redaction Request due 12/13/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2020. (dmn, )
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Transcript Acknowledgment Part III received from Court Reporter Patricia Starkie on 11th Circuit Appeal Number 19-14125-C. (dmn, )
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Transcript Acknowledgment Part II received from Court Reporter Patricia Starkie on 11th Circuit Appeal Number 19-14125-C. (dmn, )
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc. for proceedings held on May 29, 2018 before Judge Myron H. Thompson, re #70 Notice of Appeal (Gibbs, David) (Main Document 75 replaced on 10/25/2019 to attach a properly published PDF document) (amf, ). Modified on 10/25/2019 (amf, ).
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 USCA Case Number 19-14125-C for #70 Notice of Appeal filed by Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/1/2019 as to Appellant Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/15/2019 as to Appellee Amazon.com, Inc. (dmn, )
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 4602055335 re #70 Notice of Appeal filed by Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc. (dmn, )
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Transmission of #70 Notice of Appeal, #69 Judgment, #68 Opinion, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet and Appeal Record)(dmn, )
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Appeal Instructions sent to David Gibbs, counsel for Appellant Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc. re #70 Notice of Appeal. A copy of the Transcript Information Form must be mailed to each court reporter from whom you are requesting a transcript. (Attachments: #1 Transcript Information Form)(dmn, )
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc. as to #68 Opinion and #69 Judgment entered 9/19/2019. (Gibbs, David) Modified on 10/18/2019 to clean up text. (dmn, )
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 JUDGMENT: In accordance with the opinion entered this day, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court as follows: (1) Plf Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc.'s #58 objections are overruled; (2) The magistrate judge's #57 recommendation is adopted, albeit at times for reasons different from those given by the magistrate judge; (3) Dft Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.'s #42 motion to dismiss is granted; (4) Dfts Amazon.com, Inc. and AmazonSmile Foundation, Inc.'s #43 motion to dismiss is granted; (5) This lawsuit is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice; further ORDERED that costs are taxed against plf Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc., for which execution may issue; DIRECTING the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(wcl, )
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 OPINION. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/19/2019. (wcl, )
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Opinion in CIS v. Cohen)(Holliday, Shannon) Modified on 9/17/2019 to clarify docket text as reflected in pleading(am, ).
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying as moot #65 Motion for Status Conference; An opinion will issue very shortly. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/23/2019. (wcl, )
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION for Status Conference by Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc.. (Miller, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2019: #1 Corrected Signature/Certificate of Service Pages) (qc/wcl, ). Modified on 8/23/2019 to clarify the docket text (qc/wcl, ).
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 TEXT ORDER vacating #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/11/19. (NO PDF document attached to this notice).(djy, )
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Motions No Longer Referred to Mag Judge Baker: #42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREOF, #43 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint (djy, )
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle. Honorable Judge David A. Baker no longer assigned to the case as referral judge (NO PDF Document attached to this notice). (djy, )
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ambika K Doran (Doran, Ambika)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson: Oral Argument held on 5/29/2018 (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Patricia Starkie.) (ag, )
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDERED that the magistrate judge's recommendation (doc. no. #57 ) is set for oral argument on May 29, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2FMJ of the Frank M. Johnson Jr. United States Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/15/2018. (furn: calendar, ag)(kh, )
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 REPLY BRIEF re #58 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.. (Holliday, Shannon)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Response to Order re #58 Objection to Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge by Amazon.com, Inc., AmazonSmile Foundation. (Doran, Ambika)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 OBJECTION to #57 Report and Recommendations by Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc.. (Gibbs, David)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Accordingly, for the reasons stated, it is RESPECTFULLY RECOMMENDED that the SPLC's motion to dismiss (Doc. #42 ) and the Amazon Defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. #43 ) be GRANTED and that the case be dismissed with prejudice. ORDERED that the parties shall file any objections to this Recommendation on or before March 8, 2018. Signed by Honorable Judge David A. Baker on 2/21/2018. (kh, )
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Objection to re #55 Notice (Other), OF FILING OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.. (Holliday, Shannon)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE by Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc. re #43 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, #42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREOF Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Gibbs, David)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REPLY to Response to Motion re #43 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.. (Holliday, Shannon)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPLY to Response to Motion re #43 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Amazon.com, Inc., AmazonSmile Foundation. (Doran, Ambika)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint (Amazon Defendants) filed by Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc.. (Gibbs, David)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition to Defendant Southern Poverty Law Center's #42 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's #40 First Amended Complaint filed by Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc. (Gibbs, David) Modified on 11/30/2017 to reflect actual title and create link. (dmn, )
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on the parties joint motion to modify the briefing schedule on Defendants motion to dismiss. (Doc. #49 ). Upon consideration, the motion is GRANTED and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs response in opposition to the Amazon Defendants motion to dismiss and Plaintiffs response in opposition to SPLCs motion to dismiss, be filed on or before 11/29/2017, and that Defendants replies in support of their motions to dismiss be filed on or before 12/13/2017. Signed by Honorable Judge David A. Baker on 11/15/2017. (dmn, )
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Docs. #42 , #43 ) by Amazon.com, Inc., AmazonSmile Foundation, Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc., Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. (Pate, Robert) Modified on 11/14/2017 to include additional filers and create links. (dmn, )
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Tim Cunningham to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge David A. Baker on 11/13/2017. (kh, )
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Ambika K. Doran to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge David A. Baker on 11/13/2017. (kh, )
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Pro hac vice Filing fees for Ambika Doran and Tim Cunningham re Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Doc. No. #44 and #45 ): $ 100.00, receipt number 4602047410 (dmn, )
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Motion for Tim Cunningham to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amazon.com, Inc., AmazonSmile Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certificate of Good Standing)(dmn, )
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Motion for Ambika K. Doran to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amazon.com, Inc., AmazonSmile Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certificate of Good Standing)(dmn, )
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc. #42 for pdf.)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss the #40 First Amended Complaint by Amazon.com, Inc., AmazonSmile Foundation. (Prater, Harlan) Modified on 11/30/2017 to create link to Doc. #40 . (dmn, )
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION TO DISMISS #40 Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. (Holliday, Shannon) Modified on 11/30/2017 to create link to Doc. #40 . (dmn, )
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Gibbs, David)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amazon.com, Inc., AmazonSmile Foundation, GuideStar USA, Inc., Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc., filed by Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc. (Gibbs, David) Modified on 10/25/2017 to include correct name of AmazonSmile Foundation and remove AmazonSmile Foundation, Inc. (dmn, )
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re Motion to dismiss (Doc. #15 ), and Plaintiffs Motion for leave to amend the Complaint (Doc. #38 ). Plaintiffs motion (Doc. #38 ) is GRANTED and is ORDERED to file the proposed Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry. The Defendants shall file their respective responses to the Amended Complaint within 21 days after the filing of the Amended Complaint. It is further ORDERED that SPLCs motion to dismiss (Doc. #15 ) is MOOT. The hearing scheduled for Wednesday, 10/25/2017, is CANCELLED subject to rescheduling by further order of the Court. Signed by Honorable Judge David A. Baker on 10/18/2017. Copies furnished to calendar group, All MJ CRD's. (Deadline terminated: Status Conference set for 10/25/2017.)(dmn, )
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 First MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit SPLC's Consent to Amend)(Gibbs, David)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Upon consideration, Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of PaulScott Miller, (Doc. #35 ) is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge David A. Baker on 10/17/2017. (kh, ) Modified on 10/18/2017 to correct typographical error, "Palintiff's." (dmn, )
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602046489.) The referenced docket entry was modified to correct the filing fee to $50.00 and receipt number to 4602047110 due to typographical error. (dmn, ) (NO PDF)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re #35 Motion: $ 50.00, receipt number 4602047110 (dmn, )
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Motion for Paul Scott Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50.00 receipt number 4602047110.) by Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certificate of Good Standing)(dmn, ) Modified on 10/16/2017 to correct filing fee and receipt number due to typographical error. (dmn, )
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Defendants' motion to stay discovery. Upon consideration, the motion is GRANTED IN PART and it is ORDERED that discovery in this matter is stayed pending further order of this court. It is further ORDERED that the parties Rule 26(f) Report shall be due not later than October 23, 2017. Signed by Honorable Judge David A. Baker on 10/13/2017. (kh, )
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDMENT to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. (Holliday, Shannon) Modified on 10/16/2017 to reflect this is an amendment, not an actual motion; wrong event code selected when filed. (dmn, )
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition to Defendant Southern Poverty Law Clerk's #22 Joint MOTION to Stay re #18 Order, filed by Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc. (Gibbs, David) Modified on 10/13/2017 to clean up text. (dmn, )
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on Defendant Southern Poverty Law Centers (SPLC) uncontested motion to extend the deadline to file its Reply Brief in support of its motion to dismiss (Doc. #29 ), and the motion of Defendants Amazon.com, Inc., and AmazonSmile Foundation (collectively, Amazon) for an extension of time to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint (Doc. #30 ). Both motions are premised on the understanding that a motion for leave to file an Amended Complaint is forthcoming from Plaintiff. (Doc. #29 at paragraph 1; Doc. #30 at 1). Upon consideration, the motions are provisionally GRANTED and it is ORDERED as follows: If Plaintiff moves to amend the Complaint by 10/18/2017, then the Defendants shall file their respective responses to the Amended Complaint within 21 days after the filing of the Amended Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to move to amend the Complaint by 10/18/2017, then SPLCs reply and Amazons response shall both be due not later than 10/23/2017. Signed by Honorable Judge David A. Baker on 10/12/2017. (dmn, )
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (Unopposed) by Amazon.com, Inc., AmazonSmile Foundation, Inc.. (Pate, Robert)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Continue (UNCONTESTED) by Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.. (Holliday, Shannon)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: A status hearing is set for Wednesday, 10/25/2017, at 1:30 p.m. inCourtroom 2E in the United States Courthouse, 1 Church Street, Montgomery,Alabama before Honorable Judge David A. Baker. Each party must be represented by at least one attorney of record, and lead counsel should attend if possible. Parties wishing to appear telephonically may do so without further motion, but should contact chambers at least 48 hours prior to time of the hearing to make arrangements. Counsel should be prepared to discuss all aspects of this case including pending motions, if any. Signed by Honorable Judge David A. Baker on 10/3/2017. Copies furnished to calendar group and All MJ CRDs.(dmn, )
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on Defendant Southern Poverty Law Center's unopposed motion to extend the deadline to file its Reply Brief in support of its motion to dismiss. (Doc. #26 ). Upon consideration and for good cause shown, the motion is GRANTED and Defendants Reply Brief shall be due not later than October 13, 2017. Signed by Honorable Judge David A. Baker on 10/3/2017. (kh, )
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Continue (UNOPPOSED) by Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.. (Holliday, Shannon)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc.. (Gibbs, David)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JUDGMENT: Upon consideration of plaintiffs notice of dismissal (doc. no. #13 ) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of defendant Guidestar USA, Inc., it is ORDERED that: (1) All claims against defendant Guidestar USA,Inc., are dismissed without prejudice, and Guidestar USA, Inc. is terminated as a party to this action. (2) defendant Guidestar USA, Inc.s motion to dismiss (doc. no. #21 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/29/2017. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(dmn, )
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to Guidestar USA, Inc., by Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc. (Gibbs, David) Modified on 9/29/2017 to include name of party. (dmn, )
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Opposed MOTION to Stay Discovery and Brief in Support re #18 Order, by Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., AmazonSmile Foundation, and GuideStar USA, Inc. (Holliday, Shannon) Modified on 9/29/2017 to include additional filers and reflect actual title. (dmn, )
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support of #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and,in the alternative, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, filed by GuideStar USA, Inc. (dmn, )(NO PDF, see Doc. #21 for pdf.)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and, in the Alternative, , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by GuideStar USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Amazon Smile webpage, #2 Exhibit 2, Guidestar, #3 Exhibit 3, August 4, 2017 Demand)(Rigrish, Robert) Modified on 9/29/2017 to clean up text. (dmn, )
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by GuideStar USA, Inc.. (Rigrish, Robert)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David C. Gibbs, III, is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge David A. Baker on 9/18/2017. (dmn, )
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER directing the parties to file the Rule 26(f) report containing the proposed discovery plan as further set out in the order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/16/2017. It is further ORDERED that for all future motions in this case, the parties are to confer in good faith to resolve any disputes, to stipulate to points of agreement and narrow any remaining issues, and to indicate whether the motion is opposed or agreed to. Responses to motions shall be due fourteen days after the filing of the motion, and any reply to the response within seven days of the filing of the response. Should the parties wish to consent to the Magistrate Judges exercising dispositive jurisdiction over this case, they are DIRECTED to complete and send to the Clerk of the Court the attached consent form so that it is received by the Clerk as soon as possible. Signed by Honorable Judge David A. Baker on 9/18/2017. (dmn, )
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.. (Holliday, Shannon)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that Defendant's #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sona Rewari is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge David A. Baker on 9/18/2017. (dmn, )
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Attorney Robert David Segall added for Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc. #15 for pdf.)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support of #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc. #15 for pdf.)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holliday, Shannon)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Motion for Sona Rewari to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50.00 receipt number 4602046727.) by GuideStar USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B, Proposed Order, #3 Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, )
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on the #10 Unopposed Motion of Defendants Amazon.com, Inc., and AmazonSmile Foundation, incorrectly named as AmazonSmile Foundation, Inc. ("Amazon Defendants") for an extension of time to file a responsive pleading. Upon consideration, the motion is GRANTED, and it is hereby ORDERED that the Amazon Defendants shall file a responsive pleading on or before 10/16/2017. Answer due from Amazon.com, Inc. and AmazonSmile Foundation, Inc. on 10/16/2017. Signed by Honorable Judge David A. Baker on 9/14/2017. (dmn, )
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Attorney Harlan Irby Prater, IV added for Amazon.com, Inc., AmazonSmile Foundation (incorrectly named as AmazonSmile Foundation, Inc.). (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc. #10 ) ]
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by AmazonSmile Foundation, Inc.. (Pate, Robert)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Pate, Robert)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Amazon.com, Inc., AmazonSmile Foundation, Inc.. (Pate, Robert)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Lisa Witmer for GuideStar USA, Inc. served on 8/28/2017, answer due 9/18/2017. (dmn, )
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Sheila Wilkes (last name illegible) for Amazon.com, Inc. served on 8/28/2017, answer due 9/18/2017. (dmn, )
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Sheila Wilkes (last name illegible) for AmazonSmile Foundation, Inc. served on 8/28/2017, answer due 9/18/2017. (dmn, )
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Gregory Faulkner for Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. served on 8/25/2017, answer due 9/15/2017. (dmn, )
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued; summons and complaint mailed CMRRR to Amazon.com, Inc., AmazonSmile Foundation, Inc., GuideStar USA, Inc., Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. (dmn, )
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 VACATED PURSUANT TO 64 TEXT ORDER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Honorable Judge David A. Baker for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/24/2017. (dmn, ) Modified on 1/11/2019 (djy, ).
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602046489). The referenced docket text has been modified to reflect Filing fee amount to be $50.00 and receipt number to be 4602046490 due to typographical error. (dmn, ) (NO PDF)
August 22, 2017 Filing 3 Motion for David C. Gibbs, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50.00 receipt number 4602046490.) by Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, ) Modified on 8/24/2017 to correct the filing fee receipt number and amount due to typographical error. (dmn, )
August 22, 2017 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc. (dmn, )
August 22, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon.com, Inc., AmazonSmile Foundation, Inc., GuideStar USA, Inc., Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602046489.), filed by Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, )
August 22, 2017 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see #1 Complaint for pdf.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc. v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmazonSmile Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Ambika K Doran
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Tim Cunningham
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.
Represented By: Robert David Segall
Represented By: Shannon Lynn Holliday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GuideStar USA, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Ernest Rigrish
Represented By: Sona Rewari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmazonSmile Foundation
Represented By: Ambika K Doran
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Represented By: Tim Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Edward Hall, Jr.
Represented By: David C. Gibbs, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coral Ridge Ministries Media, Inc. doing business as D. James Kennedy Ministries
Represented By: Charles Edward Hall, Jr.
Represented By: David C. Gibbs, III
Represented By: David Charles Gibbs, III
Represented By: Paul Scott Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?