Brantley v. Cooks et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: |
Lerome Brantley |
Defendant: |
Mary Cooks, Warden Thomas, Captain King, V. Pittman, N. Thomas, E. Burkett, J. Whitten, Sgt. Briggs, F. Harris, Officer Griffin and J. Black |
Case Number: |
2:2018cv00471 |
Filed: |
May 7, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama |
Office: |
Montgomery Office |
County: |
Escambia |
Presiding Judge: |
Myron H. Thompson |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan Russ Walker |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 27, 2022 |
Filing
194
JUDGMENT: it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that this cause is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice and with the parties to bear their own costs; DIRECTING the Clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP; This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/27/2022. (amf, )
|
December 14, 2021 |
Filing
182
ORDER ON PRETRIAL HEARING: it is ORDERED as follows: (1) Plf Lerome Brantley's claims for failure to intervene/protect and for denial of medical care are dismissed; (2) Plf Brantley's claims for injunctive relief are dismissed; (3) Dfts Captain Brenda King, Lt. Valerie Pittman, and Officer Griffin are dismissed from the case and terminated as parties; (4) The only remaining claims are for excessive force against dfts Officer Nygeon Thomas, Officer Evan Burkett, and Officer J. Whitte n in only their individual capacities; It is further ORDERED that: (1) This case is referred to the US Magistrate Judge for mediation, as further set out in order; (2) The jury selection and trial, now set for 1/24/2022, are continued generally, pend ing mediation; (3) The parties shall file joint monthly reports on the second Monday of each month informing the court of the status of their efforts to resolve the case; The clerk is DIRECTED to administratively close this case pending mediation. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/14/2021. (Furn: Calendar, ag) (Term: Jury Selection & Trial set for 01/24/2022)(bes, )
|
November 23, 2020 |
Filing
151
OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that: (1) The 149 objections are overruled; (2) The 147 recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge is adopted; (3) The 119 motion for preliminary injunction is denied; further ORDERED that this case is referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/23/2020. (wcl, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?