Binion et al v. The United States Department of Agriculture et al (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Robert Binion and The Cowtown Foundation Inc.
Defendant: The United States Department of Agriculture and The Secretary of Agriculture
Case Number: 2:2018cv00544
Filed: June 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Chilton
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: 1) The 58 recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge is adopted; 2) The 50 motion for preliminary injunction is denied without prejudice; 3) The 51 motion to set a hearing for prelimin ary injunction argument and limited discovery regarding the same matter is denied as moot; It is further ORDERED that this case is referred back to the United States Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/21/2020. (am, )
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 OPINION AND ORDER: 1) ADOPTING the 46 recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge; 2) CONSTRUING the 37 Motion to Dismiss as a motion to dismiss or in the alternative for a more definite statement; 3) GRANTING the 37 Motion for Mo re Definite Statement; 4) DENYING the 37 Motion to Dismiss; 5) DENYING as moot the 23 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, the 24 & 34 Motions to set a Hearing, and the 42 Motion to defer the motion to dismiss, with leave to refile; 6) GRANTING the 41 & 44 Motions for leave to Amend; further ORDERING that this case is referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/24/2019. (am, )
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: (1) The 16 recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge is adopted; (2) The 1 motion for preliminary injunction is denied without prejudice; further ORDERED that this case is referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/30/2018. (wcl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Binion et al v. The United States Department of Agriculture et al (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Binion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Cowtown Foundation Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Secretary of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?