Waggener v. NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Waggener
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company, Inc., NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots and Harvey W. Watt & Co., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00675
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
2 Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/2/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/11/18. (djy, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 25 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker. Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 24 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker. Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Inc..(Wahlheim, William)
September 7, 2018 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, (Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Harvey W. Watt & Co., Inc.) by Harvey W. Watt & Co., Inc..(Cross, Kristen)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time; defs' answer or other responsive pleading shall be due on or before 9/7/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 8/31/18. (djy, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Inc., Harvey W. Watt & Co., Inc.. (Thrash, Braxton)
August 24, 2018 Filing 19 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Harvey W. Watt & Co., Inc.. (Williams, James) Modified on 8/27/2018 to reflect as satisfying #18 notice of deficiency (qc/djy, ).
August 16, 2018 Filing 18 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Harvey W. Watt & Co., Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (defendant) Harvey W. Watt & Co., Inc. (djy, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Simms Cross on behalf of Harvey W. Watt & Co., Inc. (Cross, Kristen)
August 15, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by James Sarven Williams on behalf of Harvey W. Watt & Co., Inc. (Williams, James)
August 15, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Inc. re #10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Wahlheim, William)
August 15, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Waggener. NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots waiver sent on 8/15/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Blocker, Ariel)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint; Answer due from Aetna Life Insurance Company, Inc. on 8/31/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 8/15/2018. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Deadline of Defendant Harvey W. Watt & Company, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint; Answer due from Harvey W. Watt & Co., Inc. on 8/31/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 8/15/2018. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Aetna Life Insurance Company, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to US Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Aetna Life Insurance Company, Inc. (alm, )
August 14, 2018 PURSUANT TO THE #8 MOTION - ***Attorney William Bernhart Wahlheim, Jr & Grace Robinson Murphy for Aetna Life Insurance Company, Inc. added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Inc.. (Thrash, Braxton)
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Extend Deadline of Defendant Harvey W. Watt & Company, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Christopher Waggener. (Blocker, Ariel)
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by (no signature) for NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots served on (no date given, no signature). (djy, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Laura McHaney for Aetna Life Insurance Company, Inc. served on 7/26/2018, answer due 8/16/2018. (wcl, )
July 25, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company, Inc., Harvey W. Watt & Co., Inc., NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint to defendants. (djy, )
July 25, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiff) Christopher Waggener. (djy, )
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Christopher Waggener. (djy, )
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company, Inc., Harvey W. Watt & Co., Inc., NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602050065.), filed by Christopher Waggener. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 fee receipt)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waggener v. NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Braxton Scott Thrash
Represented By: William Bernhart Wahlheim, Jr.
Represented By: Grace Robinson Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey W. Watt & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Kristen Simms Cross
Represented By: James Sarven Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Waggener
Represented By: David Paul Martin
Represented By: Ariel Seltzer Blocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?