Powell v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: LaToya Powell
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc., Trans Union, LLC and ARM Professional Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00725
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Trans Union, LLC.(Robinett, Matthew)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time and Trans Union's deadline to answer or otherwise response to plf's complaint is extended to 9/19/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 9/10/18. (djy, )
September 7, 2018 ***Attorney Adrienne D. Scott for Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. added pursuant to #16 answer (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 17 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc.. (Perry, Kenneth)
September 7, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc..(Perry, Kenneth)
September 6, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (defendant) Equifax Information Services, LLC. (djy, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Reid, Kirkland)
September 5, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Reid, Kirkland)
September 5, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Trans Union, LLC. (djy, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC. (Robinett, Matthew)
September 4, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Robinett, Matthew)
August 27, 2018 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Derrick Long for ARM Professional Services, LLC served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018. (djy, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Julie Buckner for Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. (djy, )
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Kelly Webster for Trans Union, LLC served on 8/15/2018, answer due 9/5/2018. (djy, )
August 17, 2018 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Kelly Webster for Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 8/15/2018, answer due 9/5/2018. (djy, )
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by LaToya Powell. (McDaniel, Reginald)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ARM Professional Services, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc., Trans Union, LLC and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint to defendants. (djy, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to LaToya Powell; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiff) LaToya Powell. (djy, )
August 9, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by LaToya Powell. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, )
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ARM Professional Services, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc., Trans Union, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602050288.), filed by LaToya Powell. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 fee receipt)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Kirkland Edward Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Adrienne D. Scott
Represented By: Kenneth Martin Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Whittle Robinett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARM Professional Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaToya Powell
Represented By: Reginald Daryl McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?