Worster v. Vectrus Systems Corporation
Plaintiff: Chad S. Worster
Defendant: Vectrus Systems Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv00744
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
2 Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Vectrus Systems Corporation.(Geisler, Kimberly)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Unnoposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint; Vectrus Systems Corporation answer due 10/12/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Emily C. Marks on 10/1/2018. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
September 26, 2018 ***PURSUANT TO THE #9 MOTION - Attorney Alex S. Drummond for Vectrus Systems Corporation added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Vectrus Systems Corporation. (Geisler, Kimberly)
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Vectrus Systems Corporation. (Geisler, Kimberly)
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Laura McHaney for Vectrus Systems Corporation served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. (wcl, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Emily C. Marks and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker. Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker. Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Vectrus Systems Corporation; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (wcl, )
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to US Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Chad S. Worster. (alm, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Chad S. Worster. (alm, )
August 20, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Chad S. Worster. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (alm, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vectrus Systems Corporation (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602050438.), filed by Chad S. Worster. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worster v. Vectrus Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vectrus Systems Corporation
Represented By: Kimberly Wood Geisler
Represented By: Alex S. Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad S. Worster
Represented By: Adam Michael Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?