Law Solutions Chicago, LLC et al v. Jacobs

Appellant: Cody Wayne Foote, Law Solutions Chicago, LLC, Grady Earl Carden, Upright Law, LLC and Mariellen Morrison
Appellee: Teresa R. Jacobs
Case Number: 2:2018cv00763
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Transcript of July 24, 2018 Hearing by Teresa R. Jacobs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended transcript)(Jacobs, Teresa)
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Appeal by Grady Earl Carden, Cody Wayne Foote, Law Solutions Chicago, LLC, Mariellen Morrison, Upright Law, LLC. (Mcleod, Aaron)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Teresa R. Jacobs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript)(Jacobs, Teresa)
August 29, 2018 MOTION for Leave to Appeal by Grady Earl Carden, Cody Wayne Foote, Law Solutions Chicago, LLC, Mariellen Morrison, Upright Law, LLC. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc. #1 for pdf.)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY CLERK'S TRANSMITTAL of Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number USBC 18-03046, filed by Law Solutions Chicago, LLC, Mariellen Morrison, Grady Earl Carden, Upright Law, LLC, Cody Wayne Foote. Appellant Brief due by 9/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Doc. 19, Notice of Appeal, #2 Doc. 20, Motion for Leave to Appeal, #3 Doc. 14, Memorandum Decision, #4 Doc. 15, Order, #5 USBC 18-03046 Certified Docket Sheet)(dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Law Solutions Chicago, LLC et al v. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Cody Wayne Foote
Represented By: Charles A. Armgardt
Represented By: Richard Patrick Carmody
Represented By: Aaron Gavin Mcleod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Law Solutions Chicago, LLC
Represented By: Charles A. Armgardt
Represented By: Richard Patrick Carmody
Represented By: Aaron Gavin Mcleod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Grady Earl Carden
Represented By: Charles A. Armgardt
Represented By: Richard Patrick Carmody
Represented By: Aaron Gavin Mcleod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Upright Law, LLC
Represented By: Charles A. Armgardt
Represented By: Richard Patrick Carmody
Represented By: Aaron Gavin Mcleod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mariellen Morrison
Represented By: Charles A. Armgardt
Represented By: Richard Patrick Carmody
Represented By: Aaron Gavin Mcleod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Teresa R. Jacobs
Represented By: Teresa R. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?