McConico v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc. et al (MAG+)
Plaintiff: James McConico, Jr.
Defendant: Bill Simon, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. and Mike Duke
Case Number: 2:2018cv00772
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 Response to Order re #3 Order Referring Case and Request that Service of Civil Complaint upon Defendants be Ordered by James McConico, Jr. (alm, )
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE, pursuant to 28 USC 636, to Magistrate Judge Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr for further proceedings and determination or recommendation as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/7/2018. (alm, )
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION (Declaration in support) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James McConico, Jr. (djy, )
August 31, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by James McConico, Jr. (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mike Duke, Bill Simon, Wal-Mart Stores Inc., filed by James McConico, Jr.(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McConico v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc. et al (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McConico, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?