Hurst v. Berryhill (CONSENT)
Plaintiff: Cynthia Jane Hurst
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2018cv00777
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, & #4 Order signed by Social Security Administration for Nancy A. Berryhill served on 9/17/2018. (alm, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, & #4 Order signed by Emily Sase for U.S. Attorney General served on 9/19/2018. (alm, )
September 20, 2018 ***PURSUANT TO THE #9 CONSENT - Attorney Stephen Michael Doyle for Nancy A. Berryhill added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge e-signed by counsel for Nancy A. Berryhill. (wcl, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge signed by counsel for Cynthia Jane Hurst. (wcl, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, & #4 Order signed by Hazel Tom for SSA Office of Regional Counsel served on 9/17/2018. (alm, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, & #4 Order signed by Retta C. Goss for U.S. Attorney's Office served on 9/14/2018, answer due 12/13/2018 for Nancy A. Berryhill. (alm, )
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney, Social Security Office of Regional Counsel, and U.S. Attorney General and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 compaint and #4 order. (kh, )
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDER TO ANSWER Social Security Complaint within 90 days after the date of service of the complaint; plaintiff to file brief in support within 40 days of filing of the answer; defendant's reply brief and administrative record due within 30 days of brief filing. Copies mailed to counsel. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/11/2018. (kh, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Cynthia Jane Hurst. (beh, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cynthia Jane Hurst. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP)(beh, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Cynthia Jane Hurst. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(beh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurst v. Berryhill (CONSENT)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Jane Hurst
Represented By: James Robert Bowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Stephen Michael Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?