Lee v. Chilton County Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: Larry Lee
Defendant: Linda Hand, Pam Price, Keith Moore, Jason Griffin, Chilton County Board of Education, Jim Shannon, Lori Patterson, Joe Mims and Curtis Smith
Case Number: 2:2018cv00806
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
2 Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/13/2020, in Montgomery, Alabama before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Jury Trial set for 4/27/2020, 10:00 AM, in Montgomery, Alabama before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Dispositive Motions due by 7/31/2019; Mediation Notice due by 7/10/2019; Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2019; Discovery due by 7/28/2019; Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/7/2018. (furn: ag, calendar)(kh, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Snyder, Daniel)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 26(f) ORDER: Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than November 8, 2018, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/18/2018. (kh, )
October 17, 2018 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Chief Judge William Keith Watkins no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (kh, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Chilton County Board of Education, Jason Griffin, Linda Hand, Joe Mims, Keith Moore, Lori Patterson, Pam Price, Jim Shannon, Curtis Smith. (Kent, Burgin)
October 16, 2018 ***Attorney Burgin H. Kent added for Jason Griffin, Linda Hand, Joe Mims, Keith Moore, Lori Patterson, Pam Price, Jim Shannon, Curtis Smith pursuant to #8 answer.(no pdf document attached to this entry)(kh, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Answer by Chilton County Board of Education.(Kent, Burgin)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Larry Lee. (Snyder, Daniel)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Aimee EZekiel for Chilton County Board of Education served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018; Jason Griffin served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018; Linda Hand served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018; Joe Mims served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018; Keith Moore served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018; Lori Patterson served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018; Pam Price served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018; Jim Shannon served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018; Curtis Smith served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (kh, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lacey K Danley on behalf of Larry Lee (Danley, Lacey)
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Candis Annette McGowan on behalf of Larry Lee (McGowan, Candis)
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Chilton County Board of Education, Jason Griffin, Linda Hand, Joe Mims, Keith Moore, Lori Patterson, Pam Price, Jim Shannon, Curtis Smith and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 complaint. (kh, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Larry Lee Corporate Disclosures due by 10/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Attachment)(kh, )
September 18, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Larry Lee. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chilton County Board of Education, Jason Griffin, Linda Hand, Joe Mims, Keith Moore, Lori Patterson, Pam Price, Jim Shannon, Curtis Smith ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602050741.), filed by Larry Lee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Chilton County Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Hand
Represented By: Burgin H. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Price
Represented By: Burgin H. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Moore
Represented By: Burgin H. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Griffin
Represented By: Burgin H. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chilton County Board of Education
Represented By: Burgin H. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Shannon
Represented By: Burgin H. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Patterson
Represented By: Burgin H. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Mims
Represented By: Burgin H. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Smith
Represented By: Burgin H. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Lee
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Snyder
Represented By: Lacey K Danley
Represented By: Candis Annette McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?