Fasking et al v. Merrill
Plaintiff: Kimberly Fasking, Herbert Hicks and Heather Lynn Boothe
Defendant: John H. Merrill
Case Number: 2:2018cv00809
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven Paul Gregory (Gregory, Steven)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 10/24/2018. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by John H. Merrill re #8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Lewis, Madeline)
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to John H. Merrill; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment) (wcl, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for John H. Merrill. (wcl, )
October 23, 2018 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline Hinson Lewis and Benjamin Howard Albritton on behalf of John H. Merrill. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #6 for pdf) (wcl, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint and Notices of Appearance by John H. Merrill. (Lewis, Madeline)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by B. McCaster for John H. Merrill served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (wcl, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Heather Lynn Boothe, Kimberly Fasking, Herbert Hicks. (wcl, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John H. Merrill; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (wcl, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Heather Lynn Boothe, Kimberly Fasking, Herbert Hicks. (wcl, )
September 19, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Heather Lynn Boothe, Kimberly Fasking, Herbert Hicks. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John H. Merrill (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602050755.), filed by Herbert Hicks, Kimberly Fasking, Heather Lynn Boothe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fasking et al v. Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Fasking
Represented By: Steven Paul Gregory
Represented By: Randall C Marshall
Represented By: Brock Boone
Represented By: Mary Virginia Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Hicks
Represented By: Steven Paul Gregory
Represented By: Randall C Marshall
Represented By: Brock Boone
Represented By: Mary Virginia Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Lynn Boothe
Represented By: Steven Paul Gregory
Represented By: Randall C Marshall
Represented By: Brock Boone
Represented By: Mary Virginia Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Merrill
Represented By: Madeline Hinson Lewis
Represented By: Benjamin Howard Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?