United States of America v. $10,435.00 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $10,435.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 2:2018cv00830
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #6 Warrant Issued to Brenda Arely Salgado-Duhon served on 10/15/2018. Acknowledgement filed by United States of America. (djy, )
October 31, 2018 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #6 Warrant Issued on Richard A. Rice, Jr. on 10/15/2018. Acknowledgement filed by United States of America. (djy, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by United States of America (Declaration of Publication) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Forfeiture and Advertisement Certification Report)(Neeley, Robert)
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #6 Warrant Issued on def currency, served on 10/3/2018. Acknowledgement filed by United States of America. (djy, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM issued and furnished to the USMS for service. (kh, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for United States of America (kh, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of DOCKETING ERROR re #3 Complaint, which has been stricken from the recordas an erroneous docket entry. This complaint should have been entered in 3:18-cv-836-GMB. (kh, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 (STRICKEN AS ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR) COMPLAINT against $10,435.00 in United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture Against Personal Property, #2 Proposed Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kh, )Modified on 9/28/2018 (kh, ). Modified on 9/28/2018 (kh, ). (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/28/2018) (kh, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/28/2018) (kh, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/28/2018) (kh, ). (Attachment 3 replaced on 9/28/2018) (kh, ).
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (kh, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $10,435.00 in United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture Against Personal Property, #2 Proposed Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $10,435.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $10,435.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert Randolph Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?