Carey v. Cunningham et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Demetrius Carey
Defendant: A. McClain, Ms. Cunningham, Captain McCovery, G. Babers, A. Lambert, Lt. Cousin, Officer Boynes and Patrice Richie
Case Number: 2:2018cv00832
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #8 Order signed by Olivia Hicks for Patrice Richie served on 11/16/2018, answer due 1/9/2019. (alm, )
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #8 Order signed by Olivia Hicks for A. McClain served on 11/16/2018, answer due 1/9/2019. (alm, )
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #8 Order signed by Olivia Hicks for G. Babers served on 11/16/2018, answer due 1/9/2019. (alm, )
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #8 Order signed by Olivia Hicks for Captain McCovery served on 11/16/2018, answer due 1/9/2019. (alm, )
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #8 Order signed by Olivia Hicks for Lt. Cousin served on 11/16/2018, answer due 1/9/2019. (alm, )
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #8 Order signed by Olivia Hicks for A. Lambert served on 11/16/2018, answer due 1/9/2019. (alm, )
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #8 Order signed by Olivia Hicks for Officer Boynes served on 11/16/2018, answer due 1/9/2019. (alm, )
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #8 Order signed by Olivia Hicks for Ms. Cunningham served on 11/16/2018, answer due 1/9/2019. (alm, )
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before 1/9/2019; copies mailed to plf; mailed by CMRRR with #1 complaint to the dfts, General Counsel for the AL DOC, & the Attorney General for the State of AL. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/14/2018. (alm, )
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Initial Partial Filing fee received: $ 27.00, receipt number 4602051392. (alm, )
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time; Plf is GRANTED an extension, nunc pro tunc, from 10/18/2018, to and including 11/19/2018, to comply with the court's #3 order that he submit an initial partial filing fee to the court in the amount of $27.00; DIRECTING the Clerk to furnish a copy of this order to the account clerk at the St. Clair Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/9/2018. (Copy mailed to Account Clerk at St. Clair CF as directed) (Furnished: Cashier) (alm, )
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Partial Filing Fee by Demetrius Carey. (alm, )
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Change of Address by Demetrius Carey. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #5 for pdf) (alm, )
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER denying #1 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/27/2018. (alm, )
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $27.00 be paid on or before 10/18/2018; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Bullock CF. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/27/2018. (Furnished: Cashier) (alm, )
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Demetrius Carey. (es, )
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against G. Barbers, Officer Boynes, Lt. Cousin, Ms. Cunningham, A. Lambert, A. McClain, Captain McCovery, Patrice Richie, filed by Demetrius Carey. (Attachments: #1 Alabama Inmate Grievance)(es, )
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Demetrius Carey.(No PDF document attached see docket entry #1 ). (es, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carey v. Cunningham et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain McCovery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Babers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Cousin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Boynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrice Richie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?