T.C. v. LIFESouth Community Blood Centers, Inc.
Plaintiff: T.C.
Defendant: LIFESouth Community Blood Centers, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00936
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge William Keith Watkins; Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (kh, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by T.C.. (Lawrence, Henry)
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by LIFESouth Community Blood Centers, Inc. re #8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement s (Alvis, Labella) Modified on 11/27/2018 to create the docket entry relationship. (kh, ).
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED that, on or before December 17, 2018, Plaintiff shall file a written response and show cause, if any there be, why the #6 motion should not be granted. Defendant may file a reply on or before January 2, 2019. Additionally, the parties were previously notified of the assignment of this case to a Magistrate Judge and their right to request reassignment. See Attached Explanation. As indicated in the notice of assignment, the parties must confirm their decision to consent to the Magistrate Judge in writing. Accordingly, any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judges jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before December 17, 2018. CONSENT FORMS MAY NOW BE SUBMITTED ELECTRONICALLY. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/27/2018. (kh, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to LIFESouth Community Blood Centers, Inc. Corporate Disclosures due by 12/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Attachment)(kh, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for LIFESouth Community Blood Centers, Inc. (kh, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by LIFESouth Community Blood Centers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service Chart)(Alvis, Labella)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Laura McHaney for LIFESouth Community Blood Centers, Inc. served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (kh, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for T.C. (kh, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to LIFESouth Community Blood Centers, Inc. and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 complaint.(kh, )
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by T.C.. (kh, )
October 31, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by T.C.. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIFESouth Community Blood Centers, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051254.), filed by T.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T.C. v. LIFESouth Community Blood Centers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFESouth Community Blood Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Labella S. Alvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.C.
Represented By: Henry A Lawrence, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?