Lockhart v. Bio-Medical Applications of Alabama, Inc. et al (CONSENT)

Plaintiff: Michelle Lockhart
Defendant: Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. and Bio-Medical Applications of Alabama, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00951
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 14 REPLY BRIEF re #13 Response in Opposition to Motion PLTF'S REPLY TO DEFT OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR REMAND filed by Michelle Lockhart. (Nickson, Deborah)
December 14, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Bio-Medical Applications of Alabama, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.. (Phillips, Barbara)
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.. (kh, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Michelle Lockhart. (kh, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Bio-Medical Applications of Alabama, Inc. (kh, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Michelle Lockhart. (Nickson, Deborah) (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/4/2018 to attached a published pdf document - no other changes were made) (kh, ).
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED that on or before December 14, 2018, Defendants shall file a response to the motion (Doc. #6 ), and Plaintiff shall file a reply on or before December 21, 2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 11/30/2018. (kh, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Michelle Lockhart. (Nickson, Deborah)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by Michelle Lockhart. (Nickson, Deborah)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: counsel for the parties are ORDERED to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 12/4/2018, as further set out in order; Do NOT electronically file the consent form or reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 11/13/2018. (wcl, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Bio-Medical Applications of Alabama, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc., Michelle Lockhart (kh, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bio-Medical Applications of Alabama, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.. (kh, ) Modified on 11/13/2018 to correct the filer. (kh, ).
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 Defendant's Partial MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Stat Law Claims. by Bio-Medical Applications of Alabama, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.. (kh, )
November 7, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Michelle Lockhart. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
November 7, 2018 COMPLAINT against Bio-Medical Applications of Alabama, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc., filed by Michelle Lockhart.(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bio-Medical Applications of Alabama, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, case number 03-CV-2018-901715.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051379) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lockhart v. Bio-Medical Applications of Alabama, Inc. et al (CONSENT)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Barbara Chelsea Phillips
Represented By: Kelly Fitzgerald Pate
Represented By: Marion Jefferson Starling, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bio-Medical Applications of Alabama, Inc.
Represented By: Barbara Chelsea Phillips
Represented By: Kelly Fitzgerald Pate
Represented By: Marion Jefferson Starling, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Lockhart
Represented By: Deborah Moore Nickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?