Lockett v. Price et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Aljay Lockett, Jr.
Defendant: Montgomery County and Charles Price
Case Number: 2:2018cv00957
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
0 Judge: W Harold Albritton
1 Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order 6 FINAL JUDGMENT: it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the Court that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice; DIRECTING the Clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a Final Judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 1/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(alm, )
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1) The #4 motion for extension of time to pay the filing fee is DENIED; 2) The #4 objections are OVERRULED; 3) The #3 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; 4) The #2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED; 5) This case is DISMISSED without prejudice for Lockett's failure to pay the full filing fee upon the initiation of this case in accordance with applicable federal law; A separate Final Judgment will be entered. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 1/11/2019. (alm, )
November 27, 2018 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay the Filing Fee by Aljay Lockett, Jr., as CONSIDERED in the Court's #5 Order. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #4 -2 for pdf) (alm, )
November 27, 2018 4 OBJECTION to #3 Report and Recommendations by Aljay Lockett, Jr. (dmn, )
November 15, 2018 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: 1) The #2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Aljay Lockett, Jr. be DENIED; 2) This case be dismissed without prejudice for Lockett's failure to pay the full filing fee upon the initiation of this case; Objections to R&R due by 11/29/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/15/2018. (wcl, )
November 13, 2018 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Aljay Lockett, Jr. (es, )
November 13, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Aljay Lockett, Jr.(No PDF document attached - see docket entry #1 ). (es, )
November 13, 2018 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Montgomery County, Charles Price, filed by Aljay Lockett, Jr.(es, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lockett v. Price et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aljay Lockett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?