Copeland v. Corizon LLC
Plaintiff: Michele Copeland
Defendant: Corizon LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00976
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Corizon LLC Corporate Disclosures due by 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Attachment)(kh, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Emily C. Marks; Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case as presidig judge. (kh, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Michele Copeland. (kh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2018: #1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (kh, ).
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Tanika Larosa Lakes Finney on behalf of Michele Copeland (Finney, Tanika)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, but no later than January 7, 2019, as further set out in order. Accordingly, counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete and to send to the Clerk of Court the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk of Court on or before January 7, 2019. CONSENT FORMS MAY NOW BE SUBMITTED ELECTRONICALLY TO THE CLERK OF THE COURT. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 12/13/2018. (kh, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Corizon LLC (kh, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Corizon LLC.(Piggott, Philip)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Michele Copeland (kh, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michele Copeland. Corizon LLC served on 11/21/2018, answer due 12/12/2018. (kh, )
November 19, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Michele Copeland. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Corizon LLC. and returned to counsel for personal service. (kh, ) .
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Corizon LLC ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051479.), filed by Michele Copeland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Copeland v. Corizon LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon LLC
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Copeland
Represented By: Kyle David Sawyer
Represented By: Julian Lenwood McPhillips, Jr.
Represented By: Tanika Larosa Lakes Finney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?