Franklin v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Benjimen Franklin
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00986
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Benjimen Franklin OF SETTLEMENT (Hoeffel, Joseph)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Benjimen Franklin Corporate Disclosures due by 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Attachment)(kh, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Benjimen Franklin. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC waiver sent on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019. (Hoeffel, Joseph)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC and returned to counsel for personal service. (kh, )
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED that the #2 Motion is GRANTED. Attorney Joseph C. Hoeffel is hereby admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiff for all further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/28/2018. (kh, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Benjimen Franklin (kh, )
November 26, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Benjimen Franklin. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 Motion for Joseph C. Hoeffel to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50.00 receipt number 4602051519.) by Benjimen Franklin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051517.), filed by Benjimen Franklin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjimen Franklin
Represented By: Joseph Hoeffel
Represented By: Joseph Carlo Hoeffel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?