White v. The Turning Point Foundation
Plaintiff: Jonathan White
Defendant: The Turning Point Foundation
Case Number: 2:2018cv01001
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by The Turning Point Foundation. (Adair, Robert)
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Turning Point Foundation.(Adair, Robert)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to The Turning Point Foundation Corporate Disclosures due by 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement Standing Order)(kh, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for The Turning Point Foundation (kh, )
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED that the #7 motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its answer or other responsive pleading on or before January 17, 2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 12/21/2018.(kh, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer [UNOPPOSED] by The Turning Point Foundation. (Adair, Robert)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by (illegible) for The Turning Point Foundation served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. (kh, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Jonathan White Consent to Representation (FLSA) (Stastny, Steven)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to The Turning Point Foundation and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 complaint. (kh, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Jonathan White (kh, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jonathan White. (kh, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Turning Point Foundation ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051553.), filed by Jonathan White. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. The Turning Point Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan White
Represented By: Steven Michael Stastny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Turning Point Foundation
Represented By: Robert Brett Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?