Stallworth v. Hurst et al
Plaintiff: Orrilyn Maxwell Stallworth
Defendant: Rodney W. Hurst, Matt Foshee, Kenneth Harmon and Corry McCartney
Case Number: 2:2018cv01005
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 20 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Emily C. Marks and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker. Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
January 25, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Walker, case reassigned: #15 MOTION to Dismiss (djy, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to #18 Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kenneth Harmon, Corry McCartney. (Clements, Fred) Modified on 1/25/2019 to clarify text to reflect as REPLY to #18 RESPONSE (qc/djy, ).
January 17, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Orrilyn Maxwell Stallworth. (Allsup, Michael)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER directing that plf reply to the #15 MOTION to Dismiss on or before 1/17/2019; defs may file a Reply on or before 1/24/2019; directing counsel for the parties to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the clerk on or before 1/17/2019, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 1/3/19. (djy, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kenneth Harmon, Corry McCartney. (Clements, Fred)
December 28, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Kenneth Harmon, Corry McCartney. (Clements, Fred)
December 28, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Rodney W. Hurst.(Clements, Fred)
December 26, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Kenneth Harmon, Rodney W. Hurst, & Corry McCartney.
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Corry McCartney. (Clements, Fred)
December 26, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Rodney W. Hurst. (Clements, Fred)
December 26, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Kenneth Harmon. (Clements, Fred)
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Fred Lee Clements, Jr on behalf of Kenneth Harmon, Rodney W. Hurst, Corry McCartney (Clements, Fred)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Becky Gatlin for Corry McCartney served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (djy, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Becky Gatlin for Rodney W. Hurst served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (djy, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Katrina D. Coven for Matt Foshee served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (djy, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Becky Gatlin for Kenneth Harmon served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (djy, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Matt Foshee, Kenneth Harmon, Rodney W. Hurst, Corry McCartney and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint to defendants. (djy, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiff) Orrilyn Maxwell Stallworth. (djy, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Orrilyn Maxwell Stallworth. (djy, )
November 29, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Orrilyn Maxwell Stallworth. (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Matt Foshee, Kenneth Harmon, Rodney W. Hurst, Corry McCartney ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051555.), filed by Orrilyn Maxwell Stallworth. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 fee receipt)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stallworth v. Hurst et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney W. Hurst
Represented By: Fred Lee Clements, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Foshee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Harmon
Represented By: Fred Lee Clements, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corry McCartney
Represented By: Fred Lee Clements, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orrilyn Maxwell Stallworth
Represented By: Michael L. Allsup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?