Grevious v. Montgomery Housing Authority

Plaintiff: Julia Grevious
Defendant: Montgomery Housing Authority
Case Number: 2:2018cv01006
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
2 Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Julia Grevious re #11 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Pitters, Amardo)
January 15, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Julia Grevious Corporate Disclosures due by 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Attachment)(kh, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Montgomery Housing Authority. (Beck, James)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, in light of the appearance of counsel for plaintiff, it is ORDERED that the #4 order referring this case to the United States Magistrate Judge is vacated. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/3/19. (djy, )
January 3, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred to Mag Judge Borden, order vacating referral: #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court (djy, )
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED that on or before January 11, 2019, Defendant shall show cause, if any exists, as to why the motion (Doc. #7 ) should not be granted. Plaintiff may file a reply on or before January 18, 2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 12/26/2018. (kh, )
December 25, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Julia Grevious. (Pitters, Amardo)
December 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Amardo Wesley Pitters on behalf of Julia Grevious (Pitters, Amardo)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Montgomery Housing Authority.(Beck, James)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (VACATED pursuant to #9 ORDER) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/5/2018. (dmn, ) Modified on 1/3/2019 (djy, ).
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Montgomery Housing Authority re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing Supplemental Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E- Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit F- Summons, #3 Exhibit G- Affidavit of Substantial Hardship, #4 Exhibit H- Affidavit of Julia Grevious, #5 Exhibit I- Order Granting Affidavit of Substantial Hardship)(Beck, James)
December 4, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Julia Grevious. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Montgomery Housing Authority. (kh, )
November 29, 2018 COMPLAINT against Montgomery Housing Authority, filed by Julia Grevious.(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Montgomery Housing Authority from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, AL, case number CV-2018-000523.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 602051562) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grevious v. Montgomery Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery Housing Authority
Represented By: James Edwin Beck, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Grevious
Represented By: Amardo Wesley Pitters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?