Vient v. Raycom Media et al (MAG+)

Plaintiff: Benjamin Vient
Defendant: Ellenann Yelverton, John Alexander, Raycom Media and CNHI
Case Number: 2:2018cv01054
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #3 Amended Complaint signed by Carolyn Wellen for CNHI served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (kr, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #3 Amended Complaint signed by J. Black for Raycom Media served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (kr, )
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to CNHI, Raycom Media; mailed CMRRR with copy of #3 Amended Complaint. (wcl, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 4602052207. (wcl, )
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: it is ORDERED that Plf shall pay $400 in the form of cash, a money order, or a cashier's check payable to the Clerk of the Middle District of Alabama, or file an appropriate motion, on or before 2/8/2019, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 1/28/2019. (wcl, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Raycom Media, CNHI, filed by Benjamin Vient. (No original signature) (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (wcl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2019: #2 Original Signature) (wcl, ).
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE, pursuant to 28 USC 636, to Magistrate Judge Honorable Gray M. Borden for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/3/2019. (wcl, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Alexander, Raycom Media, Ellenann Yelverton, filed by Benjamin Vient. (No fee, No IFP, No original signature) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(wcl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2019: #2 Original Signature) (wcl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vient v. Raycom Media et al (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellenann Yelverton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raycom Media
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Vient
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?