West et al v. Butler County Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: Margaret West, Regina M. Bennett, Shawnda Bell, Willie Thornton, Joseph West and Lenicki Moore
Defendant: Mickey Jones, Lois Robinson, John Strycker, Butler County Board of Education, Michael Nimmer, Brandon Sellers and Linda Hamilton
Case Number: 2:2018cv01061
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Myron H Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RULE 26(f) ORDER: ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than February 28, 2019, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/7/2019. (kh, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by John Strycker.(Reid, Holbrook)
February 4, 2019 ***Attorney Lewis Steiner Hamilton for Butler County Board of Education,Linda Hamilton, Mickey Jones,Michael Nimmer,Lois Robinson, and Brandon Sellers added pursuant to the #17 answer. (kh, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Butler County Board of Education, Linda Hamilton, Mickey Jones, Michael Nimmer, Lois Robinson, Brandon Sellers.(Seale, James)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time; extending the deadline for filing a response to the complaint to February 6, 2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/1/2019. (no pdf document attached to this entry)(kh, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Deadline February 6, 2019 by John Strycker. (Reid, Holbrook)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/23/2018. (no pdf document attached to this entry)(kh, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Butler County Board of Education, Linda Hamilton, Michael Nimmer, Lois Robinson, Brandon Sellers, John Strycker. (Seale, James)
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Butler County Board of Education, Linda Hamilton, Mickey Jones, Michael Nimmer, Lois Robinson, Brandon Sellers, John Strycker. (Seale, James)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File [Unopposed] by Butler County Board of Education, Linda Hamilton, Mickey Jones, Michael Nimmer, Lois Robinson, Brandon Sellers, John Strycker. (Seale, James)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Lenicki Moore #5 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Relf, Victoria) Modified on 1/17/2019 to create the docket entry relationship.(kh, ).
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Willie Thornton re #5 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Relf, Victoria) Modified on 1/17/2019 to create the docket entry relationship.(kh, ).
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Margaret West re #5 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Relf, Victoria) Modified on 1/17/2019 to create the docket entry relationship (kh, ).
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Shawnda Bell re #5 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. . (Relf, Victoria) Modified on 1/17/2019 to create the docket entry relationship. (kh, ).
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Regina M. Bennett re #5 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Relf, Victoria) Modified on 1/17/2019 to create the docket entry relationship (kh, ).
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Shawnda Bell, Regina M. Bennett, Lenicki Moore, Willie Thornton, and Margaret West Corporate Disclosures due by 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Attachment)(kh, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by A.K. for Butler County Board of Education served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019; Linda Hamilton served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019; Mickey Jones served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019; Michael Nimmer served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019; Lois Robinson served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019; Brandon Sellers served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019; John Strycker served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. (kh, )
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Butler County Board of Education, Linda Hamilton, Mickey Jones, Michael Nimmer, Lois Robinson, Brandon Sellers, John Strycker and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 complaint. (kh, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Joseph West. (kh, )
December 20, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Shawnda Bell, Regina M. Bennett, Lenicki Moore, Willie Thornton, Joseph West, Margaret West. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Butler County Board of Education, Linda Hamilton, Mickey Jones, Michael Nimmer, Lois Robinson, Brandon Sellers, John Strycker ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051821.), filed by Lenicki Moore, Margaret West, Joseph West, Regina M. Bennett, Willie Thornton, Shawnda Bell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West et al v. Butler County Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mickey Jones
Represented By: Lewis Steiner Hamilton
Represented By: James Robert Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lois Robinson
Represented By: Lewis Steiner Hamilton
Represented By: James Robert Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Strycker
Represented By: James Robert Seale
Represented By: Holbrook Emfinger Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butler County Board of Education
Represented By: Lewis Steiner Hamilton
Represented By: James Robert Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Nimmer
Represented By: Lewis Steiner Hamilton
Represented By: James Robert Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Sellers
Represented By: Lewis Steiner Hamilton
Represented By: James Robert Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Hamilton
Represented By: Lewis Steiner Hamilton
Represented By: James Robert Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret West
Represented By: Victoria Denise Relf
Represented By: Monica Leonette Arrington
Represented By: James Carlton Sims, Jr.
Represented By: Stanley Fitzgerald Gray
Represented By: Fred Jr. David Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina M. Bennett
Represented By: Victoria Denise Relf
Represented By: Monica Leonette Arrington
Represented By: James Carlton Sims, Jr.
Represented By: Stanley Fitzgerald Gray
Represented By: Fred Jr. David Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawnda Bell
Represented By: Victoria Denise Relf
Represented By: Monica Leonette Arrington
Represented By: James Carlton Sims, Jr.
Represented By: Stanley Fitzgerald Gray
Represented By: Fred Jr. David Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Thornton
Represented By: Victoria Denise Relf
Represented By: Monica Leonette Arrington
Represented By: James Carlton Sims, Jr.
Represented By: Stanley Fitzgerald Gray
Represented By: Fred Jr. David Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph West
Represented By: Victoria Denise Relf
Represented By: Monica Leonette Arrington
Represented By: James Carlton Sims, Jr.
Represented By: Stanley Fitzgerald Gray
Represented By: Fred Jr. David Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenicki Moore
Represented By: Victoria Denise Relf
Represented By: Monica Leonette Arrington
Represented By: James Carlton Sims, Jr.
Represented By: Stanley Fitzgerald Gray
Represented By: Fred Jr. David Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?