Eiland v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Teresa Lynn Eiland
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2018cv01063
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Correction re #9 Order to clarify text to reflect Rule 26(f) report due by 2/28/2019 not discovery deadline (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26(f) report due by 2/28/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/7/19. (djy, ) Modified on 2/7/2019 to clarify text to reflect Rule 26(f) report due by 2/28/2019 not discovery (qc/djy, ).
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Murphy, Grace)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to file answer. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/18/19. (NO PDF document attached to this notice).(djy, )
January 17, 2019 ***Attorney William Bernhart Wahlheim, Jr for Life Insurance Company of North America added pursuant to #5 motion (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Murphy, Grace)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Murphy, Grace)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, complaint and corporate disclosure statement signed by Laura McHaney for Life Insurance Company of North America served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (djy, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 complaint and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement. (kh, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Teresa Lynn Eiland. (kh, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051823.), filed by Teresa Lynn Eiland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eiland v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Lynn Eiland
Represented By: Miles Clayborn Williams
Represented By: David Paul Martin
Represented By: Ariel Seltzer Blocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Grace Robinson Murphy
Represented By: William Bernhart Wahlheim, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?